Reports for Höllwart Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Höllwart Holding AG
- Höllwart Holding AG with its legal headquarters in Zug is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of other financial institutions». Höllwart Holding AG is active.
- There are 2 active persons registered in the management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 14.09.2020. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- In the commercial register the company Höllwart Holding AG is registered under the UID CHE-483.857.862.
- There are 94 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: A-Line Swiss GmbH, AGJohnsen AG, Agrex Ecoconsult AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.08.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zug
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.039.891-0
UID/VAT
CHE-483.857.862
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Kauf, Halten und Verkauf von Beteiligungen an in- und ausländischen Gesellschaften; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SFL Holding AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Höllwart Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004977910, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
SFL Holding AG, in Zug, CHE-483.857.862, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 163 vom 24.08.2018, Publ. 4433627).
Statutenänderung:
31.08.2020.
Firma neu:
Höllwart Holding AG.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen. [Mit Statutenänderung vom 31.08.2020 wurde der Nebenzweck der Gesellschaft geändert.]. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Publication number: 4433627, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
SFL Holding AG, in Steinhausen, CHE-483.857.862, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 15.02.2018, Publ. 4058347).
Statutenänderung:
16.08.2018.
Sitz neu:
Zug.
Domizil neu:
Bahnhofstrasse 23, 6300 Zug. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Publication number: 4058347, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
SFL Holding AG, in Steinhausen, CHE-483.857.862, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 163 vom 25.08.2015, Publ. 2337215).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Höllwart, Johann, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Graz (AT), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Höllwart, Birgit, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Graz (AT), Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.