Reports for Hipp Management AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hipp Management AG
- Hipp Management AG has its legal headquarters in Sachseln, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The management of the company Hipp Management AG consists of 3 persons.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 01.07.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-101.085.985.
Management (3)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Sebastian Valentin Hipp,
Thomas Schmid,
Karl Martin Jost Schnyder von Wartensee
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.05.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sachseln
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-140.3.001.781-4
UID/VAT
CHE-101.085.985
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Halten von Beteiligungen an Kapital- und Personengesellschaften sowie die Übernahme der Geschäftsführung von Gesellschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Die Gesellschaft kann im Übrigen alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Solothurn | 22.12.2023 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 24.11.2010 | 21.12.2023 | |
Beckmann Wirtschaftsberatung AG | Luzern | <2004 | 23.11.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hipp Management AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006071291, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Hipp Management AG, in Sachseln, CHE-101.085.985, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 22.12.2023, Publ. 1005918384).
Statutenänderung:
25.06.2024.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen bzw. E-Mailadressen.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Nicht publikationspflichtige weitere Statutenänderungen.
Publication number: HR02-1005918384, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Hipp Management AG, in Sachseln, CHE-101.085.985, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 166 vom 29.08.2023, Publ. 1005825675).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ernst & Young AG (CHE-491.907.686), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
BDO AG (CHE-389.731.986), in Solothurn, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005825675, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
Hipp Management AG, in Sachseln, CHE-101.085.985, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 20.03.2023, Publ. 1005704074).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zinkann, Dr. Reinhard Christian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Gütersloh (DE), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
von Moos, Roland, von Luzern, in Luzern, Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Graf von Oppersdorff, Maximilian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Allensbach (DE), Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Flühler, Valentin Benjamin, von Oberdorf (NW), in Ennetbaden, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hipp, Sebastian Valentin, von Solothurn und deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Überlingen (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Schmid, Thomas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Brunnen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schnyder von Wartensee, Karl Martin Jost, von Luzern, in Kilchberg ZH, Direktor, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.