Address
c/o Hektor Leuenberger
Dorf 33A
4937 Ursenbach
Reports for Hinterarnialp-Aktiengesellschaft
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hinterarnialp-Aktiengesellschaft
- Hinterarnialp-Aktiengesellschaft with its legal headquarters in Ursenbach is active. Hinterarnialp-Aktiengesellschaft operates in the sector «Agriculture (various)».
- The management of the company Hinterarnialp-Aktiengesellschaft, which was founded on the 06.06.1922, consists of 5 persons.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 15.03.2022, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-100.261.386.
Management (5)
newest board members
Daniel Käser,
Fritz Widmer,
Philipp Leuenberger,
Armin Neuenschwander,
Martin Appoloni
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.06.1922
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Ursenbach
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.3.008.167-6
UID/VAT
CHE-100.261.386
Sector
Agriculture (various)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt, durch Bewirtschaftung ihrer Weiden den Aktionären zu ermöglichen, ihr Jungvieh auf rationelle Weise zu sömmern.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Hinter-Arni-Alp-Gesellschaft
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hinterarnialp-Aktiengesellschaft
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005427118, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hinterarnialp-Aktiengesellschaft, in Ursenbach, CHE-100.261.386, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 34 vom 17.02.2022, Publ. 1005407827).
Domizil neu:
c/o Hektor Leuenberger, Dorf 33A, 4937 Ursenbach.
Publication number: HR02-1005407827, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hinterarnialp-Aktiengesellschaft, in Ursenbach, CHE-100.261.386, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 07.07.2014, S.0, Publ. 1597315). [Streichung der Bemerkung, da nicht zum Eintragungstext gehörend] [gestrichen: Der von einer bisherigen Registerkarte übertragene Auszug enthält keine vor dem Uebertrag gestrichenen Tatsachen, und auch keine allfälligen früheren Statutendaten oder Tagebuch- und SHAB-Zitate. Diese können auf der im Feld "Uebertrag von" bezeichneten Handelsregisterkarte eingesehen werden.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Tanner, Hans Rudolf, von Köniz, in Sumiswald, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Leuenberger-Greub, Hektor, von Ursenbach, in Ursenbach, Kassier, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Widmer, Fritz, von Heimiswil, in Heimiswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Käser, Daniel, von Madiswil, in Leimiswil (Madiswil), Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Appoloni, Martin, von Wynigen, in Oeschenbach, Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Leuenberger, Philipp, von Ursenbach, in Sumiswald, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Neuenschwander, Armin, von Trub, in Auswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Publication number: 1597315, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hinterarnialp-Aktiengesellschaft, in Ursenbach, CHE-100.261.386, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 87 vom 07.05.2009, S. 2, Publ. 5007762).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bernhard, Hans, von Lützelflüh, in Leimiswil, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tanner, Hans Rudolf, von Köniz, in Sumiswald, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Widmer, Fritz, von Heimiswil, in Heimiswil, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.