Reports for HIG AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout HIG AG
- HIG AG has its legal headquarters in Wichtrach and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Travel agency and tour operator services».
- The company was founded on 03.03.1982.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 05.07.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company HIG AG is the following: CHE-103.245.372.
- The address is identical with 2 other active companies. These include: Gurtner Reisen AG, ris christoph fotoreportagen.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.03.1982
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wichtrach
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.010.008-3
UID/VAT
CHE-103.245.372
Sector
Travel agency and tour operator services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen und der Reise-, Tourismus- und Immobilienbranche. Die Gesellschaft kann alle diesem Zweck dienenden Handlungen vornehmen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
schindler TREUHAND | Ostermundigen | <2004 | 05.02.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Gurtners San Telmo AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: HIG AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005786814, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
HIG AG, in Wichtrach, CHE-103.245.372, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 25 vom 06.02.2015, S.0, Publ. 1974931).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gurtner, Heinz, von Heimberg, in Gals, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Prudente Gurtner, Patricia, brasilianische Staatsangehörige, in Gals, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 1974931, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gurtners San Telmo AG, in Bern, CHE-103.245.372, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 104 vom 01.06.2005, S. 3, Publ. 2861684).
Statutenänderung:
26.01.2015.
Firma neu:
HIG AG.
Sitz neu:
Wichtrach.
Domizil neu:
Sägeweg 2, 3114 Wichtrach.
Zweck neu:
Der Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Erbringung von Dienstleistungen und der Reise-, Tourismus- und Immobilienbranche. Die Gesellschaft kann alle diesem Zweck dienenden Handlungen vornehmen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre: mit gewöhnlichem Brief, per Fax oder elektronischer Post.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 26.01.2015 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet. [Neue] Weitere Adresse: Postfach 242, 3114 Wichtrach.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
schindler TREUHAND, in Ostermundigen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 2861684, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gurtners San Telmo AG, in Bern, CH-035.3.010.008-3, Betrieb eines Reisebüros, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 158 vom 20.08.2003, S. 2, Publ. 1136628).
Domizil neu:
Kornhausplatz 7, 3011 Bern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mylius, Robert, von Basel, in Zürich, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gurtner, Heinz, von Heimberg, in Gals, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.