Reports for Hiestand & Co. AG, Zweigniederlassung Wollerau
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hiestand & Co. AG, Zweigniederlassung Wollerau
- Hiestand & Co. AG, Zweigniederlassung Wollerau is a Branch with head office in Switzerland with its legal headquarters in Wollerau. Hiestand & Co. AG, Zweigniederlassung Wollerau belongs to the industry «Other construction» and is currently active.
- The management of the company Hiestand & Co. AG, Zweigniederlassung Wollerau consists of 0 persons.
- On the 05.12.2013 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-485.270.768.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.10.1973
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Wollerau
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.0.004.872-8
UID/VAT
CHE-485.270.768
CHE-105.741.110 VAT
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
[Gestrichene Zweckangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hiestand & Co. AG, Zweigniederlassung Wollerau
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1218021, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Hiestand & Co. AG, Zweigniederlassung Wollerau, in Wollerau, CHE-485.270.768, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 16.11.2009, S. 16, Publ. 5343692).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Freienbach.
Neue Identifikationsnummer Hauptsitz:
CHE-105.741.110.
Statuten Hauptsitz neu:
[Gestrichenes Statutendatum am Hauptsitz aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Registrierung Hauptsitz neu:
[Gestrichene Handelsregisterangabe des Hauptsitzes aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Zweck Hauptsitz neu:
[Gestrichene Zweckangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Angaben zur Zweigniederlassung neu:
[Gestrichene Personenangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hiestand, Reto Andreas, von Freienbach, in Wilen SZ, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 5343692, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Hiestand & Co. AG, Zweigniederlassung Wollerau, in Wollerau, CH-130.0.004.872-8, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 15.12.2006, S. 15, Publ. 3683660).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Freienbach.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hiestand, Johann, von Freienbach, in Wilen SZ, Leiter der Zweigniederlassung, mit Einzelprokura.
Publication number: 3683660, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Hiestand & Co., Zweigniederlassung Wollerau, in Wollerau, CH-130.0.004.872-8, Ausführung von sanitären Anlagen, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 17 vom 27.01.1998, S. 611).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Freienbach.
Firma neu:
Hiestand & Co. AG, Zweigniederlassung Wollerau.
Firma Hauptsitz neu:
Hiestand & Co. AG.
Rechtsform Hauptsitz neu:
Aktiengesellschaft.
Statuten Hauptsitz:
07.12.2006.
Zweck Hauptsitz neu:
Ausführung von sanitären Anlagen und Installationen sowie Handel mit und Vermietung von Waren und Rechten aller Art, vorab im Sanitärbereich;
kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hiestand, Reto Andreas, von Freienbach, in Wilen SZ, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Wollerau, unbeschränkt haftender Gesellschafter];
Hiestand, Johann, von Freienbach, in Wilen SZ, Leiter der Zweigniederlassung, mit Einzelprokura [bisher: in Freienbach].