Reports for HiCo Informatik GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout HiCo Informatik GmbH
- HiCo Informatik GmbH is a Limited liability company with its legal headquarters in Zihlschlacht. HiCo Informatik GmbH belongs to the industry «IT services» and is currently active.
- The management of the company HiCo Informatik GmbH, which was founded on the 04.11.2015, consists of one person.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 13.04.2021. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of TG under the UID CHE-160.570.738.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.11.2015
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.4.030.061-2
UID/VAT
CHE-160.570.738
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Handel mit Waren aller Art, insbesondere Hard- und Software, Computersystemen, Spezialcomputern, Zubehör, sowie Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Informatikbereich, insbesondere Service, Reparatur, Beratung und Schulung auf dem Gebiet der Informatik, Software- und Webseitenprogrammierung sowie Handel mit Lizenzen und Schutzrechten aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: HiCo Informatik GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005148104, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Nachtrag zum im SHAB Nr. 64 vom 01.04.2021 publizierten TR-Eintrag Nr. 1710 vom 29.03.2021 HiCo Informatik GmbH, in Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf, CHE-160.570.738, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 67 vom 08.04.2021, Publ. 1005143913).
Domizil neu:
Hauptstrasse 34, 8588 Zihlschlacht.
Weitere Adressen:
[nicht: Hauptstrasse 34, 8588 Zihlschlacht].
Publication number: HR02-1005143913, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 64 vom 01.04.2021 publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 1710 vom 29.03.2021 HiCo Informatik GmbH, in Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf, CHE-160.570.738, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 64 vom 01.04.2021, Publ. 1005140004).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Geher, Stefan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Scherzingen (Münsterlingen), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [nicht: Gehrer, Stefan].
Publication number: HR02-1005140004, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
HiCo Informatik GmbH, in Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf, CHE-160.570.738, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 08.10.2018, Publ. 1004471678).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hinterberger, Christian, von Altstätten, in Sitterdorf (Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 120 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Hinterberger, Heidi, von Egnach und Altstätten, in Sitterdorf (Zihlschlacht-Sitterdorf), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 80 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gehrer, Stefan, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Scherzingen (Münsterlingen), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.