Reports for Hess Management AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hess Management AG
- Hess Management AG has its legal headquarters in Amriswil and is active. It operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management consists of 8 persons. The company was founded on 09.12.2008.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 05.12.2019. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-114.624.070.
- Next to the company Hess Management AG there are 5 other active companies with an identical address. These include: ESCO PROJEKT AG, HESS IMMOBILIEN AG, Hess Investment AG.
Management (8)
newest board members
Dr. Dean Kradolfer,
Dr. Thomas M. Kirchhofer,
Martin Lehmann,
Benno Peter Gmür,
Hermann Hess
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Dean Kradolfer,
Dr. Thomas M. Kirchhofer,
Martin Lehmann,
Benno Peter Gmür,
Hermann Hess
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.12.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Amriswil
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.021.748-2
UID/VAT
CHE-114.624.070
CHE-116.329.423 VAT
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung, Projektierung, Errichtung, Vermietung, Verwaltung und den Betrieb und den Handel mit Liegenschaften sowie den Erwerb, die Verwaltung und die Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmungen sowie Finanzierungen im In- und Ausland. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten, Grundstücke erwerben, belasten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die der Förderung des Gesellschaftszweckes dienen oder die damit direkt oder indirekt in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Dienstleistungsgeschäfte tätigen, Schutzrechte aller Art erwerben, verwalten und verwerten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PROVIDA Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | St. Gallen | 15.12.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hess Management AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004775991, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Hess Management AG, in Amriswil, CHE-114.624.070, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 177 vom 13.09.2019, Publ. 1004715977).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Nüssli, Heinrich J., von Dägerlen, in Würenlos, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004715977, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Hess Management AG, in Amriswil, CHE-114.624.070, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 238 vom 07.12.2018, Publ. 1004515455).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kirchhofer, Dr. Thomas, von Auenstein, in Binningen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kradolfer, Dr. Dean, von Erlen, in Amriswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lehmann, Martin, von Neerach, in Neerach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004515455, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Hess Management AG, in Amriswil, CHE-114.624.070, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 105 vom 02.06.2016, Publ. 2866193).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Raggenbass, Christof, von Schönholzerswilen, in Kesswil, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.