Address
c/o Dr. F. Geigy
Auf der Bischoffhöhe 10
4125 Riehen
Reports for Hernando AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hernando AG
- Hernando AG with its legal headquarters in Riehen is active. Hernando AG operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The management consists of 4 persons. The company was founded on 26.04.1974.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 12.10.2023.
- The company's UID is CHE-103.008.352.
Management (4)
newest board members
Dr. Matthias Staehelin,
Catherine Geigy-Werthemann,
Dr. Jürg-Felix Geigy,
Alexander Edward Geigy
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Matthias Staehelin,
Catherine Geigy-Werthemann,
Dr. Jürg-Felix Geigy,
Alexander Edward Geigy
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.04.1974
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Riehen
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.003.014-4
UID/VAT
CHE-103.008.352
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beteiligung an Unternehmungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Finanzgeschäfte aller Art durchführen sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Basel | <2004 | 14.09.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Hernando Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hernando AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005859050, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Hernando AG, in Riehen, CHE-103.008.352, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 139 vom 22.07.2014, S.0, Publ. 1626821).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Staehelin, Dr. Matthias, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Binningen].
Publication number: 1626821, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Hernando AG, in Riehen, CHE-103.008.352, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 22.04.2014, Publ. 1462431).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Geigy, Alexander Edward, von Basel, in Therwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Bättwil];
Staehelin, Dr. Matthias, von Basel, in Binningen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1462431, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Hernando AG, in Riehen, CHE-103.008.352, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 27.12.2011, Publ. 6478576).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Geigy, Georges Antoine, von Basel, in Hergiswil NW, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, nicht mit Alexander Edward Geigy.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Geigy, Alexander Edward, von Basel, in Bättwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, nicht mit Georges Antoine Geigy].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.