Address
c/o Thomas Hintermann
Sonnenweg 1
5712 Beinwil am See
Reports for Hermine Eichenberger-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hermine Eichenberger-Stiftung
- Hermine Eichenberger-Stiftung with its legal headquarters in Beinwil am See is active. Hermine Eichenberger-Stiftung operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management consists of 5 persons. The organization was founded on 11.02.1992.
- The last commercial register change was made on 23.09.2022. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Hermine Eichenberger-Stiftung is the following: CHE-110.386.948.
Management (5)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Markus Steiner,
Peter Gloor,
Thomas Hintermann,
Thomas Wiederkehr
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.02.1992
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Beinwil am See
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.7.010.324-8
UID/VAT
CHE-110.386.948
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Stiftung ist die Unterstützung von alten, armen, kranken und gebrechlichen Einwohnern der Gemeinde Beinwil am See. Unterstützungen können auch ausgerichtet werden, wenn nicht alle vorgenannten Voraussetzungen gegeben sind, solange die Leistungen einen echten sozialen Charakter haben. Die Stiftung dient nicht dazu, die gesetzliche Sozialhilfe zu entlasten, sondern sie will ermöglichen, zusätzliche Bedürfnisse der Destinatäre zu decken und abzufangen. Die Unterstützungen dürfen nur an Einzelpersonen geleistet werden, können andererseits auch regelmässig über eine soziale Einrichtung (Altersheim, Altenpflege, Altersarbeit Kirche usw.) zugesprochen werden, damit Einzelempfänger in den Genuss kommen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Stans | 28.06.2011 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Savoy Treuhand AG | Aarau | 08.02.2007 | 27.06.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Eichenberger Hermine-Stiftung
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hermine Eichenberger-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005568119, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Hermine Eichenberger-Stiftung, in Beinwil am See, CHE-110.386.948, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 92 vom 12.05.2022, Publ. 1005472268).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schwyter, Mark, von Lachen, in Beinwil am See, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Merz, Christina, von Menziken, in Beinwil am See, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hintermann, Thomas, von Beinwil am See, in Beinwil am See, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Wiederkehr, Thomas, von Gontenschwil, in Beinwil am See, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Aktuar, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005472268, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Hermine Eichenberger-Stiftung, in Beinwil am See, CHE-110.386.948, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 5 vom 09.01.2020, Publ. 1004800292).
Urkundenänderung:
07.10.2021.
Zweck neu:
Zweck der Stiftung ist die Unterstützung von alten, armen, kranken und gebrechlichen Einwohnern der Gemeinde Beinwil am See. Unterstützungen können auch ausgerichtet werden, wenn nicht alle vorgenannten Voraussetzungen gegeben sind, solange die Leistungen einen echten sozialen Charakter haben. Die Stiftung dient nicht dazu, die gesetzliche Sozialhilfe zu entlasten, sondern sie will ermöglichen, zusätzliche Bedürfnisse der Destinatäre zu decken und abzufangen. Die Unterstützungen dürfen nur an Einzelpersonen geleistet werden, können andererseits auch regelmässig über eine soziale Einrichtung (Altersheim, Altenpflege, Altersarbeit Kirche usw.) zugesprochen werden, damit Einzelempfänger in den Genuss kommen.
Organisation neu:
[gestrichen aufgrund geänderterte Eintraugngsvorschriften gem. Art. 95 Abs. 1 lit. h. HRegV].
Publication number: HR02-1004800292, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Hermine Eichenberger-Stiftung, in Beinwil am See, CHE-110.386.948, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 183 vom 21.09.2017, Publ. 3765343).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lüthi, Marianne, von Linden, in Beinwil am See, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Merz, Christina, von Menziken, in Beinwil am See, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.