Reports for Hemag Nova AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hemag Nova AG
- Hemag Nova AG has its legal headquarters in Aadorf and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Trading in consumer goods».
- The management of the company Hemag Nova AG, which was founded on the 28.12.1983, consists of 6 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 24.07.2024.
- The company's UID is CHE-103.271.777.
- There are currently 6 trademarks or applications for the company Hemag Nova AG in the IPI database.
- There are 4 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Apoveda GmbH, Frieda Immo AG, InSmoke AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Jaakko Petteri Graef,
Stefan Meile,
Heinz Bernhard Meile,
Dirk Schäfer,
Marlene Senn
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.12.1983
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aadorf
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.000.153-2
UID/VAT
CHE-103.271.777
Sector
Trading in consumer goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Im- und Exporthandel mit Dekorationsartikeln sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revisora Revisionsgesellschaft AG | Wattwil | 08.06.2020 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Häseli Treuhand AG | Wil (SG) | <2004 | 29.06.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
Ohia | 07.09.2020 | active | 02289/2020 |
Azlan | 20.08.2020 | active | 02288/2020 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Hemag Nova AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006092944, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Hemag Nova AG, in Aadorf, CHE-103.271.777, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 240 vom 09.12.2022, Publ. 1005624952).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Flükiger, Roman, von Dürrenroth, in Kollbrunn (Zell (ZH)), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Graef, Jaakko Petteri, genannt Jaska, finnischer Staatsangehöriger, in Andelfingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schäfer, Dirk, von Diessenhofen, in Berlingen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: Schäfer, Dirk Alexander, deutscher Staatsangehöriger].
Publication number: HR02-1005624952, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Hemag Nova AG, in Aadorf, CHE-103.271.777, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 108 vom 08.06.2020, Publ. 1004905190). [Teils-Aktualisierung der Funktionsbezeichnung.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meile, Stefan, von Fischingen, in Stettfurt, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Frauenfeld, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Meile, Heinz, von Fischingen, in Stettfurt, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Flükiger, Roman, von Dürrenroth, in Kollbrunn (Zell (ZH)), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Schäfer, Dirk Alexander, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Berlingen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Senn, Marlene, von Winterthur, in Rickenbach ZH, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004905190, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Hemag Nova AG, in Aadorf, CHE-103.271.777, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 202 vom 18.10.2018, Publ. 1004479589). [Der Verzicht auf eine eingeschränkte Revision wurde aufgehoben.] [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 15.06.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Revisora Revisionsgesellschaft AG (CHE-108.035.451), in Wattwil, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.