Reports for Hediger & Partner AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hediger & Partner AG
- Hediger & Partner AG has its legal headquarters in Schönenwerd, is active and operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The company was founded on 19.08.2002 and has one person in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 17.04.2023.
- The company is registered in the commercial register SO under the UID CHE-109.681.056.
- Companies with the same address as Hediger & Partner AG: Ballyhouse AG, Martin Eitelbuss, Onlinehandel Ardüser.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.08.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Schönenwerd
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.023.731-1
UID/VAT
CHE-109.681.056
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Planung und Ausführung von Architekturarbeiten, Generalunternehmung und Verwaltung von Liegenschaften; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand AG Lenzburg | Lenzburg | <2004 | 28.05.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- STPC-Hediger & Partner AG
- STPC Immobilien & Planungs AG
- Spörri & Schmitter Architekten AG
- Spörri & Partner AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hediger & Partner AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005725031, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Hediger & Partner AG, in Schönenwerd, CHE-109.681.056, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 42 vom 01.03.2023, Publ. 1005690168).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Egli, Walter Thomas, von Egolzwil, in Ennetbaden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005690168, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Hediger & Partner AG, in Schönenwerd, CHE-109.681.056, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 35 vom 20.02.2023, Publ. 1005682488).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jurth, Alkibiades Lempira, von Basel, in Spreitenbach, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005682488, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Hediger & Partner AG, in Schönenwerd, CHE-109.681.056, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 253 vom 29.12.2020, Publ. 1005061171).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eitelbuss, Martin, von Rupperswil, in Schönenwerd, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.