Reports for HBB Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout HBB Holding AG
- HBB Holding AG is currently active and the industry «Operation of investment companies». The legal headquarters are in Walzenhausen.
- HBB Holding AG has 3 persons entered in its management.
- On the 23.04.2015 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company HBB Holding AG is registered under the UID CHE-101.137.955.
- On the same address as HBB Holding AG there are 4 other active companies registered. These include: ACATIS Fair Value Investment AG, ACATIS Investment Kapitalverwaltungsgesellschaft mbH, Frankfurt am Main, Zweigniederlassung Walzenhausen, ACATIS Service GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.09.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Walzenhausen
Commercial Registry Office
AR
Commercial register number
CH-300.3.013.889-2
UID/VAT
CHE-101.137.955
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Verwaltung, Erwerb und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an Unternehmen aller Art des In- und Auslandes sowie Erbringung von Dienstleistungen für die Beteiligungsgesellschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundeigentum erwerben und veräussern und Kapitalanlagen aller Art halten und verwalten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Truvag Treuhand und Revisions AG St.Gallen | St. Gallen | 23.04.2015 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | St. Gallen | 24.08.2012 | 22.04.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Hafra Holding AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: HBB Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2114133, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
HBB Holding AG, in Walzenhausen, CHE-101.137.955, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 45 vom 06.03.2014, Publ. 1383343).
Statutenänderung:
17.04.2015.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 600'000.00 [bisher: CHF 350'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 600'000.00 [bisher: CHF 350'000.00].
Aktien neu:
60'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 10.00. [bisher: 35'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 10.00]. Bei der ordentlichen Kapitalerhöhung vom 17.04.2015 wird eine Forderung in der Höhe von CHF 500'000.00 verrechnet, wofür 25'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 10.00 ausgegeben werden. Streichung der Statutenbestimmung über die mit Ermächtigungsbeschluss vom 01.06.2012 eingeführte genehmigte Kapitalerhöhung infolge Ablaufs der zeitlichen Befristung.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch einfach Brief an deren zuletzt bekanntgegebene Adresse.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-364.598.872), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frauenknecht, Hans, von Zuzwil SG, in Rorschach, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Wolfhalden, Mitglied mit Einzelunterschrift];
Ruprecht, Fritz, von Laupen, in Ittigen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bölsterli, Rolf, von Winterthur, in Lutzenberg, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Truvag Treuhand und Revisions AG St. Gallen (CHE-108.040.713), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 1383343, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
HBB Holding AG, in Walzenhausen, CHE-101.137.955, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 34 vom 19.02.2014, Publ. 1354539).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mörtlseder, Gabriela, von Appenzell, in Wattwil, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 1354539, Commercial Registry Office Appenzell A. Rh., (300)
HBB Holding AG, in Walzenhausen, CHE-101.137.955, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 30.09.2013, Publ. 1101123).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mörtlseder, Gabriela, von Appenzell, in Wattwil, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.