Reports for Hangar41 Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hangar41 Sàrl
- Hangar41 Sàrl is active in the industry «Operation of bars» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Sion.
- Hangar41 Sàrl was founded on 06.01.2017.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 24.08.2023.
- The company Hangar41 Sàrl is registered under the UID CHE-249.854.613.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.01.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.4.017.588-7
UID/VAT
CHE-249.854.613
Sector
Operation of bars
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
L'exploitation et le commerce de tout ce qui est en lien avec les produits vinicoles et les produits de consommation et l'exploitation d'une onothèque, bar à vin, cave à cigare, piano bar, etc. (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Gastroconsult AG | Zürich | 26.01.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hangar41 Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005823264, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Hangar41 Sàrl, à Sion, CHE-249.854.613, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 18 du 26.01.2023, Publ. 1005662655).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Balet, Christian, de Grimisuat, à Grimisuat, associé, sans droit de signature, pour 6 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Nicevic-Nicolas, Fiona, de Carrouge (VD), à Grimisuat, associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle, pour 8 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: Nicolas, Fiona, pour 2 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005662655, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Hangar41 Sàrl, à Sion, CHE-249.854.613, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 7 du 11.01.2017, p.0, Publ. 3276803). [biffé: Selon déclaration du 15.12.2016, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.].
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Gastroconsult AG (CHE-106.027.162), à Zürich, organe de révision.
Publication number: 3276803, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Hangar41 Sàrl, à Sion, CHE-249.854.613, Chemin Saint-Hubert 41, 1950 Sion, société à responsabilité limitée (nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
15.12.2016.
But:
L'exploitation et le commerce de tout ce qui est en lien avec les produits vinicoles et les produits de consommation et l'exploitation d'une onothèque, bar à vin, cave à cigare, piano bar, etc. (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.00.
Obligations de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communication aux associés:
par écrit, par fax ou par courriel.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Balet, Christian, de Grimisuat, à Grimisuat, associé, sans droit de signature, pour 6 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00;
Nicolas, Roger, de Carrouge VD, à Grimisuat, associé, sans droit de signature, pour 12 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00;
Nicolas, Fiona, de Carrouge VD, à Grimisuat, associée et gérante, avec signature individuelle, pour 2 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00. Selon déclaration du 15.12.2016, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.