Address
c/o Notariat Katharina Walter
Kanonengasse 16
4410 Liestal
Reports for H. & M. Hofmann-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout H. & M. Hofmann-Stiftung
- H. & M. Hofmann-Stiftung is active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Liestal.
- The management of the organization H. & M. Hofmann-Stiftung consists of 6 persons. The foundation of the organization took place on 19.10.2009.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 01.03.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BL is CHE-115.146.096.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Andreas Sutter,
Felix Finkbeiner,
Dr. Erich Paul Mäder,
Hugo Krattiger,
Katharina Walter
newest authorized signatories
Andreas Sutter,
Felix Finkbeiner,
Dr. Erich Paul Mäder,
Hugo Krattiger,
Katharina Walter
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.10.2009
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Liestal
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.7.013.160-2
UID/VAT
CHE-115.146.096
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Stiftung ist die Linderung sozialer Härten und die Förderung begabter Schüler in Liestal sowie die Förderung des kulturellen Lebens in den Kantonen Basel-Landschaft und Basel-Stadt, im besonderen den Verein 'Baselbieter Konzerte' mit Sitz in Liestal und das Kammerorchesterbasel in Basel. Die Stiftung hat gemeinnützigen Charakter und verfolgt keinerlei Erwerbszweck.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Liestal | 01.03.2024 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Duttweiler & Partner Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Liestal | 23.10.2009 | 29.02.2024 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: H. & M. Hofmann-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005975055, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
H. & M. Hofmann-Stiftung, in Liestal, CHE-115.146.096, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 08.07.2022, Publ. 1005516476).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Duttweiler & Partner Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-113.952.407), in Liestal, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
BDO AG (CHE-147.528.510), in Liestal, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005516476, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
H. & M. Hofmann-Stiftung, in Liestal, CHE-115.146.096, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 242 vom 13.12.2021, Publ. 1005355576).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hofmann-Marthaler, Margrit, von Liestal und Sissach, in Liestal, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005355576, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
H. & M. Hofmann-Stiftung, in Liestal, CHE-115.146.096, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 163 vom 26.08.2019, Publ. 1004702449).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sutter, Andreas, von Basel, in Basel, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten];
Krattiger, Hugo, von Rickenbach (BL), in Rickenbach (BL), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten [bisher: Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.