Reports for Gschwend AG Gastro-Bau
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gschwend AG Gastro-Bau
- Gschwend AG Gastro-Bau has its legal headquarters in Thun and is active. It operates in the sector «Interior design and decoration».
- The management of the company Gschwend AG Gastro-Bau, which was founded on the 14.02.1962, consists of 2 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 04.07.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- In the commercial register the company Gschwend AG Gastro-Bau is registered under the UID CHE-102.465.356.
- There are 6 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Belvista Holding AG, Gschwend Gastrobau Holding AG, Invisio AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.02.1962
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Thun
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.006.209-0
UID/VAT
CHE-102.465.356
Sector
Interior design and decoration
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt als Gesamteinrichter die Ausführung von Aufträgen der Innenarchitektur, insbesondere im Gastronomiebereich sowie den Handel mit allen damit zusammenhängenden Einrichtungsgegenständen. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, gleichartige oder ähnliche Unternehmen erwerben und sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
WISTAG Revision AG | Thun | 21.08.2008 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Thun | 20.09.2006 | 20.08.2008 | |
B&N Treuhand GmbH | Steffisburg | <2004 | 19.09.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Gschwend AG Raumgestaltung Steffisburg
- Möbelfabrik Gschwend AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gschwend AG Gastro-Bau
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006075381, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gschwend AG Gastro-Bau, in Thun, CHE-102.465.356, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 94 vom 16.05.2022, Publ. 1005474067).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brönnimann, Hans, von Gurzelen, in Steffisburg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zürcher, Raymond, von Frutigen, in Unterseen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Zürcher, Samuel, von Frutigen, in Thun, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005474067, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gschwend AG Gastro-Bau, in Thun, CHE-102.465.356, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 23.05.2018, Publ. 4243003).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brönnimann, Claudine, von Gurzelen, in Steffisburg, Mitglied, Sekretärin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brönnimann, Hans, von Gurzelen, in Steffisburg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 4243003, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gschwend AG Gastro-Bau, in Thun, CHE-102.465.356, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 8 vom 12.01.2017, Publ. 3278229).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Zürcher, Raymond, von Frutigen, in Unterseen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.