Address
c/o Burgergemeinde Safnern
Talstrasse 5
2553 Safnern
Reports for Gryfeberg AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gryfeberg AG
- Gryfeberg AG with its legal headquarters in Safnern is active. Gryfeberg AG operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- Gryfeberg AG was founded on 23.12.1997.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 16.09.2021. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-100.901.582.
Management (5)
newest board members
Jan Bratschi,
Silvia Rihs,
Sabine Bratschi,
Kurt Rihs-Torres da Silva
newest authorized signatories
Jan Bratschi,
Silvia Rihs,
Sabine Bratschi,
Kurt Rihs-Torres da Silva,
Susi Gerber-Leitner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.12.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Safnern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.006.765-6
UID/VAT
CHE-100.901.582
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vermarktung des Kiesabbaus im Gebiet Gryfeberg sowie Wiederaufforstung der Parzellen nach erfolgtem Abbau und Rückverkauf der Parzellen an die Burgergemeide Safnern nach erfolgter Aufforstung. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmen, welche gleiche oder ähnliche Zwecke verfolgen, beteiligen oder solche Unternehmen übernehmen, Liegenschaften erwerben und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Reluko Treuhand AG | Biel/Bienne | 17.05.2004 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revag Treuhand AG | Biel/Bienne | <2004 | 16.05.2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gryfeberg AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005292390, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gryfeberg AG, in Safnern, CHE-100.901.582, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 145 vom 30.07.2018, Publ. 4387859).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bratschi, Walter, von Safnern, in Safnern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bratschi, Jan, von Safnern, in Safnern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bratschi, Sabine, von Safnern, in Safnern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Enggaard-Bratschi, Sabine].
Publication number: 4387859, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gryfeberg AG, in Safnern, CHE-100.901.582, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 15.07.2016, Publ. 2955333).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Dick, Fritz, von Safnern, in Safnern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rihs, Silvia, von Safnern, in Safnern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2955333, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gryfeberg AG, in Safnern, CHE-100.901.582, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 152 vom 11.08.2014, Publ. 1656075).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bratschi, Hans-Peter, von Safnern, in Safnern, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bratschi-Feller, Erika, von Safnern, in Safnern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rihs-Torres da Silva, Kurt, von Safnern, in Safnern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Enggaard-Bratschi, Sabine, von Safnern, in Safnern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.