Reports for Grunderco SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Grunderco SA
- Grunderco SA has its legal headquarters in Mathod and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Trading with machines».
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 12.05.2021, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Grunderco SA is registered in the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-259.977.890.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Grunderco Holding SA, RS Boissons snc.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Benjamin Flachs,
Christian Penet,
Jean-Luc Dominique Favre,
François Tissot
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.04.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Mathod
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.166.971-0
UID/VAT
CHE-259.977.890
CHE-116.281.348 VAT
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'achat, la vente, la construction, le montage et la réparation de tous véhicules, machines agricoles et autres engins assimilés, notamment dans le domaine de la protection de l'environnement et l'élimination des déchets (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIDUCIAIRE WUARIN & CHATTON SA | Genève | 12.05.2021 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BfB Société Fiduciaire Bourquin frères et Béran SA | Genève | 02.05.2016 | 11.05.2021 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Grunderco SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005179803, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Grunderco SA, à Mathod, CHE-259.977.890 (FOSC du 02.04.2020, p. 0/1004864961). BfB Société Fiduciaire Bourquin frères et Béran SA (CHE-105.927.672) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
FIDUCIAIRE WUARIN & CHATTON SA (CHE-107.749.424), à Genève.
Publication number: HR02-1004864961, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Grunderco SA, à Mathod, CHE-259.977.890 (FOSC du 11.03.2020, p. 0/1004850163). La signature de Boccard Jean-Bernard et Burel Guillaume est radiée. Signature collective à deux, toutefois avec un administrateur, est conférée à Flachs Benjamin, de France, à Doussard (France), directeur.
Publication number: HR02-1004850163, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Grunderco SA, à Mathod, CHE-259.977.890 (FOSC du 22.05.2019, p. 0/1004636135). Bonnet Nicolas et Schmalz John ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.