Reports for Groupe vétérinaire des Ducats Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Groupe vétérinaire des Ducats Sàrl
- Groupe vétérinaire des Ducats Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Orbe and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Veterinary medicine».
- The management of the company Groupe vétérinaire des Ducats Sàrl consists of 4 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 31.01.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VD is CHE-106.579.160.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.02.1990
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Orbe
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.178.147-7
UID/VAT
CHE-106.579.160
Sector
Veterinary medicine
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'exploitation d'un cabinet vétérinaire.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Cabinet vétérinaire des Ducats Sàrl
- Cabinet vétérinaire des Ducats, A. Meystre et D. Hiltbrand
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Groupe vétérinaire des Ducats Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005949067, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Groupe vétérinaire des Ducats Sàrl, à Orbe, CHE-106.579.160 (FOSC du 31.01.2018, p. 0/4026945). Hiltbrand Daniel, maintenant à Valeyres-sous-Montagny, cède 30 de ses 150 parts de CHF 100 à Frauenlob David, de Oetwil am See, à Bavois, nouvel associé sans signature, titulaire de 30 parts de CHF 100. Pradervand Marcel cède 30 de ses 150 parts de CHF 100 à Villaverde Donet Javier, d'Espagne, à Morges, nouvel associé sans signature, titulaire de 30 parts de CHF 100;
Hiltbrand Daniel et Pradervand Marcel, restent titulaire de 120 parts de CHF 100 chacun.
Publication number: 4026945, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Cabinet vétérinaire des Ducats Sàrl, à Orbe, CHE-106.579.160 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Statuts modifiés le 20 décembre 2017.
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
Groupe vétérinaire des Ducats Sàrl.
Nouvelle adresse:
rue des Ducats 38, 1350 Orbe. Meystre Alexandre, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 150 parts de CHF 100 à Pradervand Marcel, de Bernex, à Rueyres, nouvel associé-gérant avec signature individuelle, avec 150 parts de CHF 100.
Publication number: 5746682, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Cabinet vétérinaire des Ducats Sàrl, à Orbe, CH-550-0178147-7, exploitation d'un cabinet vétérinaire (FOSC du 20.07.2010, p. 19/5736080).
Rectificatif:
lors de la transformation, il est attribué aux associés 300 parts sociales de CHF 100 (et non 300 actions comme publié).
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.