Reports for Gröflin Werkzeugbau AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gröflin Werkzeugbau AG
- Gröflin Werkzeugbau AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Frenkendorf. Gröflin Werkzeugbau AG belongs to the industry «Production of metal goods» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 16.01.1985.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 02.07.2021. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Gröflin Werkzeugbau AG is the following: CHE-107.789.808.
- Companies with the same address as Gröflin Werkzeugbau AG: Grag Härterei und Apparatebau AG, Piezo-Kristall AG, Studer Treuhand AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.01.1985
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Liestal
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.916.553-6
UID/VAT
CHE-107.789.808
Sector
Production of metal goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Fabrikation von Werkzeugen und Stanzartikeln, sowie die Ausführung von Reparaturen an maschinellen Einrichtungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Hersberger Revisionsgesellschaft AG | Seltisberg | <2004 | 07.04.2005 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gröflin Werkzeugbau AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005237249, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Gröflin Werkzeugbau AG, in Liestal, CHE-107.789.808, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 168 vom 31.08.2018, Publ. 4445829). [gestrichen: Der von einer bisherigen Registerkarte übertragene Auszug enthält keine vor dem Übertrag gestrichenen Tatsachen, und auch keine allfälligen früheren Statutendaten oder Tagebuch- und SHAB-Zitate. Diese können auf der im Feld "Übertrag von" bezeichneten Handelsregisterkarte eingesehen werden.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Studer, Roman, von Binningen, in Seltisberg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Studer, Christiane, von Binningen, in Seltisberg, Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Studer, Toni Roman Fabian, von Binningen, in Seltisberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 4445829, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Gröflin Werkzeugbau AG, in Liestal, CHE-107.789.808, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 227 vom 23.11.2015, Publ. 2496505).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schönenberger, René, von Kriechenwil, in Gelterkinden, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 2496505, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Gröflin Werkzeugbau AG, in Liestal, CHE-107.789.808, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 17.12.2013, Publ. 1240429).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Studer, Roman, von Binningen, in Seltisberg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Leymen (FR)];
Studer, Christiane, von Binningen, in Seltisberg, Vizepräsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Leymen (FR)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.