Address
Industriestrasse West 40, Grünes Zentrum
4614 Hägendorf
Reports for greenSys AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout greenSys AG
- greenSys AG is currently active and the industry «Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)». The legal headquarters are in Hägendorf.
- The company was founded on 23.04.1997 and has 7 persons in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 14.05.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of SO is CHE-108.600.842.
Management (7)
newest board members
Philipp Hauert,
Markus Beck,
Rolf Schläpfer,
Anton Sonderegger,
Dr. Jakob Hans Bär
newest authorized signatories
Philipp Hauert,
André gen. Andi Heusser,
Anton Sonderegger,
Dr. Jakob Hans Bär,
Alois Peter von Atzigen
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.04.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Hägendorf
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-249.3.003.812-6
UID/VAT
CHE-108.600.842
Sector
Operation of a publishing agency (analog/digital)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Zahlungsverkehr, der Informatik und damit zusammenhängende Dienstleistungen; fördert wirtschaftliche Rahmenbedingungen für die grüne Branche; ermöglicht günstigere Einkaufsmöglichkeiten durch praxisnahe und rationelle Dienstleistungen; kann Grundstücke verwalten, veräussern und belasten; ist befugt, alle Geschäfte durchzuführen, welche mit dem Gesellschaftszweck direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Solidis Revisions AG | Olten | <2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- greenSys
- ESG Zahlungs-Systeme AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
greenSys | 24.07.2006 | active | 52000/2006 |
Newest SOGC notifications: greenSys AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006031484, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
greenSys AG, in Hägendorf, CHE-108.600.842, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 232 vom 27.11.2020, Publ. 1005033483).
Domizil neu:
Grünes Zentrum, Industriestrasse West 40, 4614 Hägendorf.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schädeli, Armin, von Kirchlindach, in Winkel, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Elmer, Beat, von Niederurnen, in Meisterschwanden, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hauert, Philipp, von Grossaffoltern, in Bern, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bär, Dr. Jakob, von Hirzel, in Ziefen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Mettmenstetten];
Schläpfer, Rolf, von Rehetobel, in Kesswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: in Horn];
Heusser, André, von Hochfelden, in Oberhofen am Thunersee, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005033483, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
greenSys AG, in Hägendorf, CHE-108.600.842, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 111 vom 11.06.2020, Publ. 1004908269).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rütter, Otto, von Luzern, in Ballwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004908269, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
greenSys AG, in Hägendorf, CHE-108.600.842, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 20.04.2018, Publ. 4184521).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Suter, Arnold, von Kilchberg ZH, in Kilchberg ZH, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schädeli, Armin, von Kirchlindach, in Winkel, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Beck, Markus, von Sursee, in Ruswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Schläpfer, Rolf, von Rehetobel, in Horn, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.