Reports for Gravières de L'Isle S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gravières de L'Isle S.A.
- Gravières de L'Isle S.A. has its legal headquarters in L'Isle and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Mining of stones and earth».
- The management of the company Gravières de L'Isle S.A., which was founded on the 26.05.1964, consists of 4 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 15.04.2021.
- The company's UID is CHE-101.239.194.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Giancarlo Del Sordo,
Pascal Voirol,
Brigitte Ambrosi Sacconi Natali,
Hans-Peter Arnold
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.05.1964
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
L'Isle
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.078.032-6
UID/VAT
CHE-101.239.194
Sector
Mining of stones and earth
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Achat, exploitation et mise en valeur de gravières.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA, succursale de Lausanne (VD) | Lausanne | 18.08.2020 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young SA | Lausanne | 25.07.2005 | 17.08.2020 | |
Société Fiduciaire 'Lemano' SA en liquidation | Lausanne | <2004 | 24.07.2005 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Gravières de L'Isle SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gravières de L'Isle S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005150540, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Gravières de L'Isle S.A., à L'Isle, CHE-101.239.194 (FOSC du 18.08.2020, p. 0/1004960143). La signature de Guillet Laurent est radiée. Signature collective à deux, avec un administrateur, est conférée à Del Sordo Giancarlo, de et à Bussigny, directeur.
Publication number: HR02-1004960143, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Gravières de L'Isle S.A., à L'Isle, CHE-101.239.194 (FOSC du 06.08.2018, p. 0/4399421). Ernst & Young SA n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA, succursale de Lausanne (VD) (CHE-357.215.278), à Lausanne.
Publication number: 4399421, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Gravières de L'Isle S.A., à L'Isle, CHE-101.239.194 (FOSC du 11.12.2015, p. 0/2535003). La signature de Guignard Daniel est radiée. Signature collective à deux, avec un administrateur, est conférée à Guillet Laurent, de Treyvaux, à Echarlens, directeur.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.