Reports for GrafTech Switzerland SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout GrafTech Switzerland SA
- GrafTech Switzerland SA in Bussigny is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Trading with machines». GrafTech Switzerland SA is active.
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 15.06.2022.
- The reported UID is CHE-108.692.436.
- There are 11 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Creditreform Romandie GNT SA, Geo Data Solutions, IT IS GIS SA, GO Conseils Sàrl.
Management (4)
newest board members
Timothy Kevin Flanagan,
Iñigo Perez Ortiz,
Jeremy Shawn Halford,
Fabio Ervino Alfonso Spirgi
newest authorized signatories
Timothy Kevin Flanagan,
Iñigo Perez Ortiz,
Jeremy Shawn Halford,
Fabio Ervino Alfonso Spirgi
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.11.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bussigny
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.084.113-0
UID/VAT
CHE-108.692.436
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toute activité en relation avec la production et l'utilisation de produits en carbone et en graphite et, notamment, d'électrodes en carbone et en graphite; prise ou acquisition de brevets, marques de fabrique, licences, autres droits de propriété intellectuelle et procédés relatifs aux activités visées ci-dessus; création, acquisition, construction, installation, prise à bail et exploitation d'usine, de fonds de commerce et de locaux nécessaires aux activités susvisées ou pouvant en faciliter l'extension et le développement; fabrication ou revente de matériel et équipement relatif aux activités visées ci-dessus, ainsi que prestations de services relatives auxdites activités; toute prestation dans les affaires de même nature ou se rattachant directement ou indirectement auxdites activités.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte SA | Genève | 14.12.2015 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Pully | 10.08.2004 | 13.12.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- UCAR S.A.
- UCAR SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: GrafTech Switzerland SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005496443, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
GrafTech Switzerland SA, à Bussigny, CHE-108.692.436 (FOSC du 09.12.2021, p. 0/1005353613). Coburn Quinn J n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Flanagan Timothy Kevin, des USA, à North Royalton (USA), est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005353613, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
GrafTech Switzerland SA, à Bussigny, CHE-108.692.436 (FOSC du 22.04.2020, p. 0/1004875427). Karleskind Jean-Yves n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Perez Ortiz Iñigo est nommé président et directeur général.
Publication number: HR02-1004875427, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
GrafTech Switzerland SA, à Bussigny, CHE-108.692.436 (FOSC du 24.01.2020, p. 0/1004813915).
Nouvel administrateur avec signature individuelle:
Perez Ortiz Iñigo, d'Espagne, à Genève.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.