Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for GRÄFF CAPITAL MANAGEMENT AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.06.1991
Deletion from the commercial register
28.01.2020
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.000.855-0
UID/VAT
CHE-107.309.887
Sector
Fund management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vermögensberatungen, Finanzberatungen und -verwaltungen; kann Liegenschaften erwerben, überbauen, veräussern und verwalten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland, die gleiche oder ähnliche Zwecke verfolgen, beteiligen, solche Unternehmungen erwerben oder pachten sowie alle Geschäfte durchführen, die mit dem Gesellschaftszweck direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen oder ihn zu fördern geeignet sind.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Contor Treuhand AG | Zürich | 24.02.2010 | 27.01.2020 | |
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 31.01.2007 | 23.02.2010 | |
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | <2004 | 30.01.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: GRÄFF CAPITAL MANAGEMENT AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1004815515, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
GRÄFF CAPITAL MANAGEMENT AG, in Zürich, CHE-107.309.887, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 234 vom 03.12.2019, Publ. 1004773069).
Aktiven und Passiven (Fremdkapital) gehen infolge Fusion auf die Abalone Suisse SA (neu:
Abalone Gräff SA), in St. Moritz (CHE-362.032.482), über. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1004773069, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
GRÄFF CAPITAL MANAGEMENT AG, in Zürich, CHE-107.309.887, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 54 vom 19.03.2013, S.0, Publ. 7109892).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Colapinto, Roberto, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in St. Moritz, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gräff, Markus, von Uitikon und Volketswil, in Hettlingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Valente, Stefano, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Samedan, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Contor Treuhand AG (CHE-101.926.142), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Contor Treuhand AG (CH-020.3.905.905-1)].
Publication number: 7109892, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
GRÄFF CAPITAL MANAGEMENT AG, in Zürich, CH-020.3.000.855-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 02.11.2012, Publ. 6915000).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sauser, Ralph Philipp, von Solothurn, in Freienbach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Keller, Andreas, von Weinfelden, in Wollerau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.