Reports for gommisWALDKraft AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout gommisWALDKraft AG
- gommisWALDKraft AG has its legal headquarters in Gommiswald and is active. It operates in the sector «Heating and cooling utilities».
- The management of the company gommisWALDKraft AG, which was founded on the 23.11.2011, consists of 3 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 29.12.2017.
- The reported UID is CHE-191.517.154.
- Allenspach Architekten AG, Baugenossenschaft Adlerwies, eiba gmbh are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.11.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Gommiswald
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.070.351-6
UID/VAT
CHE-191.517.154
Sector
Heating and cooling utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines nicht gewinnorientierten Wärmeverbundes in Gommiswald. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten sowie Liegenschaften kaufen, belehnen oder verkaufen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
STR Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Freienbach | 28.11.2011 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: gommisWALDKraft AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3962377, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
gommisWALDKraft AG, in Gommiswald, CHE-191.517.154, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 28.11.2011, Publ. 6434334).
Domizil neu:
Hof 8, 8737 Gommiswald, .
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gebert, Hanspeter, von Gommiswald, in Gommiswald, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Leuzinger, Fritz, von Glarus, in Gommiswald, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Allenspach-Schumacher, Benno, von Oberbüren, in Gommiswald, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Uetliburg SG (Gommiswald), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Giger, Markus, von Quarten, in Weesen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gräzer, Urban, von Einsiedeln, in Gommiswald, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 6434334, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
gommisWALDKraft AG, in Gommiswald, CH-320.3.070.351-6, c/o Hanspeter Gebert, Dorfplatz 7, 8737 Gommiswald, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
18.11.2011.
Zweck:
Betrieb eines nicht gewinnorientierten Wärmeverbundes in Gommiswald. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten sowie Liegenschaften kaufen, belehnen oder verkaufen. .
Aktienkapital:
CHF 120'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 120'000.00.
Aktien:
120 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, Telefax oder Email an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Eingetragene Personen:
Gebert, Hanspeter, von Gommiswald, in Gommiswald, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Allenspach-Schumacher, Benno, von Oberbüren, in Uetliburg SG (Gommiswald), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Leuzinger, Fritz, von Glarus, in Gommiswald, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
STR Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CH-130.3.016.045-2), in Freienbach, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.