Reports for Goldrichtig GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Goldrichtig GmbH
- Goldrichtig GmbH has its legal headquarters in Uetendorf and is active. It operates in the sector «Manufacturing of jewellery and similar products».
- Goldrichtig GmbH has one person entered in its management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 14.01.2010. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-110.554.022.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.03.2004
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Uetendorf
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.4.016.446-7
UID/VAT
CHE-110.554.022
Sector
Manufacturing of jewellery and similar products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Goldschmiedeateliers. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Goldrichtig GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5441154, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Goldrichtig GmbH, in Uetendorf, CH-092.4.016.446-7, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 15.03.2007, S. 5, Publ. 3840572). [Die Bemerkung über die Streichung des Liberierungsgrades wird gestrichen, da nicht zur Eintragung gehörend.] [gestrichen: Streichung der Angabe des Liberierungsgrades des Stammkapitals, da nicht zur Eintragung gehörend.].Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 23.03.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Publication number: 3840572, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Goldrichtig GmbH, in Uetendorf, CH-092.4.016.446-7, Betrieb eines Goldschmiedeateliers, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 46 vom 08.03.2004, S. 4, Publ. 2157890).
Statutenänderung:
7.03.2007. Streichung der Angabe des Liberierungsgrades des Stammkapitals, da nicht zur Eintragung gehörend. [gestrichen: Liberierung Stammkapital: CHF 20'000.--.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Reinhard-Aebersold, Doris, von Sumiswald, in Steffisburg, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 1'000.--.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Reinhard, Daniel, von Sumiswald, in Steffisburg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 20'000.-- [bisher: mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 19'000.--].
Publication number: 2157890, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Goldrichtig GmbH, in Uetendorf, Hohlengasse 2, 3661 Uetendorf, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
27.02.2004.
Zweck:
Betrieb eines Goldschmiedeateliers. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.--.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB.
Liberierung Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.--. Die Einladungen und Mitteilungen an die GesellschafterInnen erfolgen schriftlich.
Eingetragene Personen:
Reinhard, Daniel, von Sumiswald, in Steffisburg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 19'000.--;
Reinhard-Aebersold, Doris, von Sumiswald, in Steffisburg, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einer Stammeinlage von CHF 1'000.--.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.