Reports for Globolinks GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Globolinks GmbH
- Globolinks GmbH with its legal headquarters in Naters is a Limited liability company from the sector «Other schools on secondary school niveau». Globolinks GmbH is active.
- Globolinks GmbH has one person entered in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 27.05.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- Globolinks GmbH is registered in the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-116.213.364.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.11.2010
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Naters
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.4.014.320-0
UID/VAT
CHE-116.213.364
Sector
Other schools on secondary school niveau
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer Sprachschule, Anbieten von Übersetzungsdiensten und Nachhilfeunterricht sowie Organisation von Sprachreisen und Sprachaufenthalte. Kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Globolinks GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006040742, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Globolinks GmbH, in Naters, CHE-116.213.364, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 48 vom 09.03.2018, Publ. 4103767).
Domizil neu:
Bahnhofstrasse 21, 3904 Naters.
Publication number: 4103767, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Globolinks GmbH, in Naters, CHE-116.213.364, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 227 vom 22.11.2010, Publ. 5904110).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Salzmann, Jeanine, von Naters, in Naters, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Anthamatten-Acosta, Maria Luisa, von Saas-Almagell, in Naters, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 19 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: 5904110, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Globolinks GmbH, in Naters, CH-600.4.014.320-0, Weingartenstrasse 62, 3904 Naters, neue Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung.
Statutendatum:
3.11.2010.
Zweck:
Betrieb einer Sprachschule, Anbieten von Übersetzungsdiensten und Nachhilfeunterricht sowie Organisation von Sprachreisen und Sprachaufenthalte. Kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder veräussern.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.--. Nebenleistungspflichten gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail. Gemäss Erklärung der Gründer vom 03.11.2010 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Anthamatten-Acosta, Maria Luisa, von Saas-Almagell, in Naters, Gesellschafterin und Vorsitzende der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 19 Stammanteilen von je CHF 1'000.--;
Salzmann, Jeanine, von Naters, in Naters, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.--.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.