Reports for GLASS MASTER AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout GLASS MASTER AG
- GLASS MASTER AG has its legal headquarters in Baar, is active and operates in the sector «Trading in consumer goods».
- The management has 3 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 29.04.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-261.182.902.
- There are 98 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: 1881 S Group AG, Abello & Co. GmbH, Achtzig und Acht Immobilien AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.07.2016
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Baar
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.040.599-0
UID/VAT
CHE-261.182.902
Sector
Trading in consumer goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausübung von Handel, Verwertung und Beratung von Gütern jeglicher Art, insbesondere von Glas Produkten; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- GLASS MASTER LTD
- GLASS MASTER SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: GLASS MASTER AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006020088, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
GLASS MASTER AG, bisher in Luzern, CHE-261.182.902, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 20.04.2022, Publ. 1005453982).
Statutenänderung:
10.04.2024.
Sitz neu:
Baar.
Domizil neu:
Lättichstrasse 6, 6340 Baar.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen. [Ferner Änderung nicht publikationspflichtiger Tatsachen].
Publication number: HR02-1006020000, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
GLASS MASTER AG, in Luzern, CHE-261.182.902, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 76 vom 20.04.2022, Publ. 1005453982). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Baar im Handelsregister des Kantons Zug eingetragen und im Handelsregister des Kantons Luzern von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005453982, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
GLASS MASTER AG, in Luzern, CHE-261.182.902, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 246 vom 17.12.2021, Publ. 1005359995).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Engler, Nadja, von Zürich, in Bassersdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Blanz, Beat, von Schaffhausen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kutlu, Kadir Turgut, türkischer Staatsangehöriger, in Istanbul (TR), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Duran, Ercan, von Adliswil, in Altendorf, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Zoccolillo, Biagio, von Küsnacht (ZH), in Küsnacht (ZH), Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.