Reports for giw gmbh
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout giw gmbh
- giw gmbh with its legal headquarters in Watt is a Limited liability company from the sector «IT services». giw gmbh is active.
- The management of the company giw gmbh consists of one person.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 15.10.2021.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-108.448.936.
- The address is identical with 5 other active companies. These include: Axenion AG, Cocobees, Berthel Estrada, EFT Essers Frank Trading GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.04.1996
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Regensdorf
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-320.4.040.620-1
UID/VAT
CHE-108.448.936
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Produktion, Design, Handel und Vertrieb von Waren und Dienstleistungen, sowie Beratung, Planung, Ausführung und Schulung im IT-Bereich, sowie in anderen Segmenten. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- GIW GmbH
- GIW Gossau GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: giw gmbh
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005313025, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
giw gmbh, in Regensdorf, CHE-108.448.936, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 137 vom 17.07.2020, Publ. 1004939186).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Glesti, Peter, von Wagenhausen, in Pfäffikon, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004939186, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
giw gmbh, in Regensdorf, CHE-108.448.936, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 30.12.2019, Publ. 1004794635).
Domizil neu:
Niederhaslistrasse 6, 8105 Watt.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Willi, Georg Ignaz, von Mels, in Wetzikon (ZH), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Chiang Mai (TH)].
Publication number: HR02-1004794635, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
giw gmbh, in Buchs (ZH), CHE-108.448.936, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 55 vom 18.03.2016, S.0, Publ. 2731377).
Statutenänderung:
12.12.2019.
Sitz neu:
Regensdorf.
Domizil neu:
c/o Renato Manetsch, Niederhaslistrasse 6, 8105 Watt.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Waldvogel, Reto René, von Unteriberg, in Regensdorf, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, .
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Willi, Georg Ignaz, von Mels, in Chiang Mai (TH), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: in Stadel, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Glesti, Peter, von Wagenhausen, in Pfäffikon, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.