Reports for Gipo AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gipo AG
- Gipo AG is active in the industry «Trading with machines» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Seedorf UR.
- The management of the company Gipo AG consists of 4 persons.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 06.02.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of UR under the UID CHE-106.511.050.
- On the same address there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: Emil Gisler AG, Maschinenbau und Hydraulik, Emil Gisler Holding AG, Gimise-GmbH.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Stadler,
Claudia Gisler,
Karl Josef Gasser,
Sabine Arnold-Gisler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.10.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Seedorf (UR)
Commercial Registry Office
UR
Commercial register number
CH-120.3.000.886-6
UID/VAT
CHE-106.511.050
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit sowie Vertrieb, Import und Export von Maschinen und Fahrzeugen; kann Lizenzen, Marken und Patente erwerben, verwalten und verwerten und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft Mattig-Suter und Partner | Schwyz | 14.06.1995 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gipo AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005670466, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Gipo AG, in Seedorf (UR), CHE-106.511.050, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 83 vom 30.04.2020, Publ. 1004880186).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gasser, Karl Josef, von Isenthal, in Seedorf (UR), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Gasser-Longani, Karl].
Publication number: HR02-1004880186, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Gipo AG, in Seedorf (UR), CHE-106.511.050, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 149 vom 04.08.2017, Publ. 3679719).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stadler, Thomas, von Kriens, in Oberdorf (NW), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3679719, Commercial Registry Office Uri, (120)
Gipo AG, in Seedorf (UR), CHE-106.511.050, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 06.10.2016, Publ. 3093419).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gisler, Emil, von Unterschächen, in Seedorf (UR), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gisler, Claudia, von Unterschächen, in Seedorf (UR), Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.