Address
Route des Châtaigniers 9
1816 Chailly-Montreux
Branches (5)
Reports for Ginox SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ginox SA
- Ginox SA has its legal headquarters in Chailly-Montreux, is active and operates in the sector «Furniture manufacturing».
- The management consists of 9 persons. The company was founded on 03.04.2003.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 12.06.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VD is CHE-110.055.078.
Management (9)
newest board members
Philippe Ciocca,
Jean-Gabriel Hardt,
Jacques Gabriel Berger,
Laurent Charles Berney
newest authorized signatories
Philippe Ciocca,
Jean-Gabriel Hardt,
David Fonjallaz,
Fabien Roch,
Nadia Pesenti
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.04.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Montreux
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.033.881-5
UID/VAT
CHE-110.055.078
CHE-116.329.564 VAT
Sector
Furniture manufacturing
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrication de cuisines industrielles, serrurerie, constructions métalliques ainsi que développement commercial de ces activités.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO SA | Epalinges | 12.06.2024 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Pully | <2004 | 11.06.2024 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ginox SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006055271, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Ginox SA, à Montreux, CHE-110.055.078 (FOSC du 02.10.2023, p. 0/1005850187). Hofer Jérôme n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Ciocca Philippe est nommé président. Sem Raphaël est maintenant à Bourg-en-Lavaux. PricewaterhouseCoopers SA n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
BDO SA (CHE-347.141.454), à Epalinges.
Publication number: HR02-1005850187, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Ginox SA, à Montreux, CHE-110.055.078 (FOSC du 30.06.2022, p. 0/1005509138). Hofer Jérôme est maintenant à Dubaï (Emirats arabe unis). Hardt Jean-Gabriel, désormais à Ollon, est nommé administrateur. Procuration collective à deux, avec un membre du conseil d'administration, est conférée à Fonjallaz David, de Bourg-en-Lavaux, à Vevey, Pesenti Nadia, de Oberkulm, à Corsier-sur-Vevey, Roch Fabien, de Château-d'Oex, à Lausanne, et Sem Raphaël, de Lausanne, à Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne.
Publication number: HR02-1005509138, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Ginox SA, à Montreux, CHE-110.055.078 (FOSC du 01.10.2021, p. 0/1005303370). Berger Jacques, de Grosshöchstetten, à Morges, avec signature collective à deux, et Berney Laurent, de Collex-Bossy, à Collonge-Bellerive, avec signature collective à deux, sont membres du conseil d'administration.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.