Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for GHP Arbitrium Immobilien AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.07.2005
Deletion from the commercial register
20.03.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.028.893-8
UID/VAT
CHE-112.431.873
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, Veräusserung sowie Verwaltung und Vermietung von Liegenschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen, ferner Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Grant Thornton AG | Zürich | 08.07.2005 | 19.03.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- GHP Arbitrium Immobilien AG
- Arbitrium Immobilien AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: GHP Arbitrium Immobilien AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2053275, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
GHP Arbitrium Immobilien AG in Liquidation, in Zürich, CHE-112.431.873, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 169 vom 03.09.2014, Publ. 1694665). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird mit Bestätigung des zugelassenen Revisionsexperten vom 12.12.2014 vor Ablauf des Sperrjahres gelöscht.
Publication number: 1694665, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
GHP Arbitrium Immobilien AG, in Zürich, CHE-112.431.873, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 207 vom 26.10.2009, S. 25, Publ. 5309608).
Firma neu:
GHP Arbitrium Immobilien AG in Liquidation. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 22.08.2014 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grob, Daniel, von Lengnau AG, in Lengnau AG, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Grant Thornton Bankrevision AG (CHE-107.841.337), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Bankrevisions- und Treuhand AG].
Publication number: 5309608, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
GHP Arbitrium Immobilien AG, in Zürich, CH-020.3.028.893-8, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 96 vom 21.05.2007, S. 21, Publ. 3937996).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Seeholzer, Peter, von Zürich und Feusisberg, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Häni, Theodor K., von Wängi, in Weggis, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Künzli, Dr. Florian, von Zürich und Strengelbach, in Zollikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grob, Daniel, von Lengnau AG, in Lengnau AG, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Sekretär (Nichtmitglied) ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Pfründer, Rolf, von Märstetten, in Weggis, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Seeholzer, Michael, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.