Address
c/o Rolf Wildi
Maienweg 13
5102 Rupperswil
Reports for Genossenschaft Yetnet Kabelnetz Rupperswil
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft Yetnet Kabelnetz Rupperswil
- Genossenschaft Yetnet Kabelnetz Rupperswil from Rupperswil operates in the sector «Telephone and telecommunications» and is active.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The organization was founded on 27.05.1977.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 09.07.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-103.926.822.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.05.1977
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Rupperswil
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.5.002.546-3
UID/VAT
CHE-103.926.822
Sector
Telephone and telecommunications
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Genossenschaft bezweckt, ihre Genossenschafter mit Telekommunikations- und Multimediadiensten zu versorgen. Sie errichtet die notwendigen Kabelleitungen und schliesst sich einem allfällig gegründeten regionalen Zweckverband an.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Gruber Partner AG | Aarau | 17.08.2015 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Amrhein Treuhand AG | Aarau | 03.09.2010 | 16.08.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Yetnet Rupperswil Kabelnetz-Genossenschaft YERU
- Antennengenossenschaft Rupperswil AGRU
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft Yetnet Kabelnetz Rupperswil
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006079826, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Genossenschaft Yetnet Kabelnetz Rupperswil, in Rupperswil, CHE-103.926.822, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 237 vom 06.12.2022, Publ. 1005621088).
Domizil neu:
c/o Rolf Wildi, Maienweg 13, 5102 Rupperswil.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Oswald, Tobias, von Rapperswil-Jona, in Rupperswil, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kälin-Hanselmann, Gabriella, von Olten, in Suhr, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wildi, Rolf, von Schafisheim, in Rupperswil, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005621088, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Genossenschaft Yetnet Kabelnetz Rupperswil, in Rupperswil, CHE-103.926.822, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 61 vom 28.03.2022, Publ. 1005436931).
Domizil neu:
c/o Tobias Oswald, Tannenweg 1, 5102 Rupperswil.
Publication number: HR02-1005436931, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Yetnet Rupperswil Kabelnetz-Genossenschaft (YERU), in Rupperswil, CHE-103.926.822, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 90 vom 11.05.2020, Publ. 1004886798).
Statutenänderung:
26.08.2020.
Firma neu:
Genossenschaft Yetnet Kabelnetz Rupperswil.
Zweck neu:
Die Genossenschaft bezweckt, ihre Genossenschafter mit Telekommunikations- und Multimediadiensten zu versorgen. Sie errichtet die notwendigen Kabelleitungen und schliesst sich einem allfällig gegründeten regionalen Zweckverband an.
Pflichten neu:
Beitrags- oder Leistungspflichten der Genossenschafter gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Méroz, René, von Sonvilier, in Rupperswil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brucker, Raphael, von Berikon, in Rupperswil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kälin-Hanselmann, Gabriella, von Olten, in Suhr, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Makowski, Frank, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Gontenschwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.