Address
c/o Stefan Dürr
Helvetierstrasse 48
4106 Therwil
Reports for Genossenschaft 'Wohnstadt am Deich'
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft 'Wohnstadt am Deich'
- Genossenschaft 'Wohnstadt am Deich' has its legal headquarters in Therwil and is active. It is a Cooperative and active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the organization Genossenschaft 'Wohnstadt am Deich' consists of 4 persons. The foundation of the organization took place on 03.02.1982.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 08.07.2021.
- The reported UID is CHE-101.702.128.
Management (4)
newest members of the administration
Stephan Dürr,
Fausto Biasiolli,
Thomas Meier Diener,
Michael Liscio
newest authorized signatories
Stephan Dürr,
Fausto Biasiolli,
Thomas Meier Diener,
Michael Liscio
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.02.1982
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Therwil
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.5.910.333-5
UID/VAT
CHE-101.702.128
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Regelung der Benützungsverhältnisse sowie der Verwaltung und des Unterhalts der in der Siedlung "am Deich" gemeinsam beanspruchten Anlagen, Einrichtungen und Installationen. Förderung der nachbarschaftlichen Beziehungen und gemeinschaftlichen Aktivitäten im Rahmen der Siedlungs-Genossenschaft und in der näheren Umgebung.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Wohnstadt am Deich
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft 'Wohnstadt am Deich'
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005244105, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Genossenschaft "Wohnstadt am Deich", in Therwil, CHE-101.702.128, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 224 vom 17.11.2017, Publ. 3876513).
Domizil neu:
c/o Stefan Dürr, Helvetierstrasse 48, 4106 Therwil.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meier, Nicole, von Basel, in Therwil, Präsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hämmerle, Rafaela, von Biel-Benken, in Therwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stückelberger, Dr. Johannes, in Therwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dürr, Stephan, von Pratteln, in Therwil, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Biasiolli, Fausto, von Chiasso, in Therwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Meier Diener, Thomas, von Bubendorf, in Therwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3876513, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Genossenschaft 'Wohnstadt am Deich', in Therwil, CHE-101.702.128, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 167 vom 31.08.2015, Publ. 2346911).
Domizil neu:
c/o Nicole Meier, Helvetierstrasse 40, 4106 Therwil.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmid, Philipp, von Kaiseraugst, in Therwil, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Niederberger, Benno, von Wolfenschiessen, in Therwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Suhr, Marc, von Basel, in Therwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meier, Nicole, von Basel, in Therwil, Präsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hämmerle, Rafaela, von Biel-Benken, in Therwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Liscio, Michael, von Wattwil, in Therwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2346911, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Genossenschaft 'Wohnstadt am Deich', in Therwil, CHE-101.702.128, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 170 vom 04.09.2014, Publ. 1697351).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bossert, Tobias, von Basel, in Therwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung und Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fricke, Markus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Therwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Letze, Irene, von Basel, in Therwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung und Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Niederberger, Benno, von Wolfenschiessen, in Therwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident der Verwaltung mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Schmid, Philipp, von Kaiseraugst, in Therwil, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Suhr, Marc, von Basel, in Therwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung und Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.