Reports for Genossenschaft Windland
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft Windland
- Genossenschaft Windland from Winterthur operates in the sector «Electrical power production and utilities» and is active.
- The management consists of 4 persons. The organization was founded on 25.04.1997.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 01.02.2021.
- Genossenschaft Windland is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-104.418.824.
- There are 12 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: BE YOU GmbH, BLUMER CPC GMBH, Genossenschaft "SolVent".
Management (4)
newest members of the administration
Martin Märki,
Annette Roschewitz,
Peter Nikolai Maly,
Joseph André Vogel
newest authorized signatories
Martin Märki,
Annette Roschewitz,
Peter Nikolai Maly,
Joseph André Vogel
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.04.1997
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Winterthur
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.5.000.260-6
UID/VAT
CHE-104.418.824
Sector
Electrical power production and utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Genossenschaft bezweckt: - die Entwicklung sowie die Anwendung der Sonnen- und Windenergienutzung; - den Kauf, die Erstellung und den Betrieb von Solar-, Wind - und kombinierten Anlagen zur Netzeinspeisung sowie deren Vermarktung; - die Aufklärung und sachgerechte Information über die Nutzung der alternativen Energien - die Förderung weiterer innovativer Ideen im Bereich der Anwendung und Nutzung von alternativen Energien. Die Genossenschaft verfolgt keine Erwerbszwecke.
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft Windland
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005087886, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Genossenschaft Windland, in Benken (ZH), CHE-104.418.824, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 139 vom 21.07.2020, Publ. 1004941416).
Statutenänderung:
23.09.2020.
Sitz neu:
Winterthur.
Domizil neu:
Rosenstrasse 11, 8400 Winterthur.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Märki, Martin, von Mandach, in Winterthur, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004941416, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Genossenschaft Windland, in Benken (ZH), CHE-104.418.824, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 190 vom 02.10.2019, Publ. 1004727993).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Spalinger, Ulrich, von Marthalen, in Winterthur, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004727993, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Genossenschaft Windland, in Benken (ZH), CHE-104.418.824, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 29.09.2009, S.27, Publ. 5267386).
Statutenänderung:
23.05.2019.
Zweck neu:
Die Genossenschaft bezweckt: - die Entwicklung sowie die Anwendung der Sonnen- und Windenergienutzung;
- den Kauf, die Erstellung und den Betrieb von Solar-, Wind - und kombinierten Anlagen zur Netzeinspeisung sowie deren Vermarktung;
- die Aufklärung und sachgerechte Information über die Nutzung der alternativen Energien - die Förderung weiterer innovativer Ideen im Bereich der Anwendung und Nutzung von alternativen Energien. Die Genossenschaft verfolgt keine Erwerbszwecke.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bilger, Marianne, von Zürich, in Unterstammheim, Mitglied der Verwaltung und Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Vogel, Martin, von Ossingen, in Truttikon, Mitglied der Verwaltung und Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Oesterreicher, Jürg, von Winkel und Zürich, in Truttikon, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spalinger, Ulrich, von Marthalen, in Winterthur, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Maly, Peter, von Rain, in Winterthur, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Roschewitz, Annette, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Vogel, André Joseph, von Escholzmatt-Marbach, in Winterthur, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.