Reports for Genossenschaft St. Gervais
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft St. Gervais
- Genossenschaft St. Gervais is a Cooperative with its legal headquarters in Biel/Bienne. Genossenschaft St. Gervais belongs to the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active.
- The organization was founded on 01.01.1920.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 18.10.2022.
- In the commercial register the organization Genossenschaft St. Gervais is registered under the UID CHE-102.373.926.
- KartellCulturel, St. Gervais Biel AG, TROUBLESHOOTER Event GmbH have the same address as Genossenschaft St. Gervais.
Management (6)
newest members of the administration
Dana Augsburger-Brom,
Mascia Nuzzello Sanson,
Christoph Kobi,
Gerhard Graber,
Ursula Kilian
newest authorized signatories
Dana Augsburger-Brom,
Christoph Kobi,
Ursula Kilian,
Emil Jan Mollet
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.01.1920
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Biel/Bienne
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.5.005.452-0
UID/VAT
CHE-102.373.926
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Genossenschaft hat zum Zweck der Allgemeinheit und insbesondere ihren Mitgliedern den Vorteil eines familiären Lokals zu erhalten; kulturelle und künstlerische Aktivitäten zu unterstützen; die Liegenschaft an der Untergasse 21 in Biel zu verwalten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Genossenschaft St-Gervais
- Restaurant et Coopérative St-Gervais RCG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft St. Gervais
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005585265, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Genossenschaft St. Gervais, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-102.373.926, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 06.01.2017, Publ. 3263883).
Statutenänderung:
25.08.2021.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kaegi, Pascal, von Basel, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Schaffer, Beat, von Stettlen, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mollet, Emil Jan, von Rüti bei Büren, in Biel/Bienne, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Kilian, Ursula, von Les Breuleux, in Biel/Bienne, Vizepräsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Donzé-Meier, Ursula, Vizepräsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Augsburger-Brom, Dana, von Biel/Bienne und Langnau im Emmental, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied und Sekretärin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Kobi, Christoph, von Rapperswil (BE), in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied + Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Nuzzello, Mascia, italienische Staatsangehörige, in Sutz (Sutz-Lattrigen), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.]
Publication number: 3263883, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Genossenschaft St. Gervais, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-102.373.926, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 151 vom 08.08.2014, Publ. 1654143).
Statutenänderung:
25.05.2016. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Augsburger-Brom, Dana, von Biel/Bienne und Langnau im Emmental, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Graber, Gerhard, von Sigriswil, in Grenchen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Schaffer, Beat, von Stettlen, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: 1654143, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Genossenschaft St. Gervais, in Biel/Bienne, CHE-102.373.926, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 81 vom 29.04.2014, Publ. 1474359).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Cherbuin, Anne, von Corcelles-près-Payerne, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied und Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kümmin, Peter, von Wollerau, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Graber, Gerhard, von Sigriswil, in Grenchen, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Kobi, Christoph, von Rapperswil BE, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied und Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kaegi, Pascal, von Basel, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.