Address
c/o Martin Thurnheer
Kornackerweg 18
4132 Muttenz
Reports for Genossenschaft Solardächer Muttenz
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft Solardächer Muttenz
- Genossenschaft Solardächer Muttenz with its legal headquarters in Muttenz is active. Genossenschaft Solardächer Muttenz operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The organization was founded on 28.05.2013 and has 3 persons in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 29.08.2022.
- In the commercial register the organization Genossenschaft Solardächer Muttenz is registered under the UID CHE-314.269.923.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.05.2013
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Muttenz
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.5.016.904-9
UID/VAT
CHE-314.269.923
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Genossenschaft ist es, dass sich die Genossenschafter und Genossenschafterinnen, insbesondere Eigentümer und Eigentümerinnen von Liegenschaften im Dorfkern zur Entlastung der Dachlandschaft von Solaranlagen, mit ideellem und finanziellem Engagement an Produktionsanlagen zur Erzeugung von Solarenergie und damit zur Förderung erneuerbarer Energie beteiligen können. Die Genossenschaft hat ferner den Zweck, die Genossenschafter zur Selbsthilfe über die Entwicklungen im Bereiche der erneuerbaren Energie, insbesondere der Solarenergie, zu informieren und zu beraten. Die Genossenschaft kann zur Zweckerfüllung ein Unternehmen betreiben sowie Immobilien, Wertschriften, Beteiligungen und geistiges Eigentum erwerben und veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft Solardächer Muttenz
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005549560, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Genossenschaft Solardächer Muttenz, in Muttenz, CHE-314.269.923, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 166 vom 29.08.2019, Publ. 1004705202).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hirsig-Geiger, Petra, von Amsoldingen, in Muttenz, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Braun, Roland Uwe, von Muttenz, in Muttenz, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004705202, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Genossenschaft Solardächer Muttenz, in Muttenz, CHE-314.269.923, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 28.09.2016, Publ. 3078123).
Domizil neu:
c/o Martin Thurnheer, Kornackerweg 18, 4132 Muttenz.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Speitel, Cécile, von Muttenz, in Muttenz, Präsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Thurnheer, Martin, von Muttenz, in Muttenz, Präsident der Verwaltung, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 3078123, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Genossenschaft Solardächer Muttenz, in Muttenz, CHE-314.269.923, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 204 vom 22.10.2013, Publ. 1139341).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Speitel, Cécile, von Muttenz, in Muttenz, Präsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Hirsig-Geiger, Petra, von Amsoldingen, in Muttenz, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, Aktuarin, Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Issler, Peter, von Davos, in Muttenz, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Thurnheer, Martin, von Muttenz, in Muttenz, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.