Address
c/o LANDI Graubünden AG
Löserstrasse 11
7302 Landquart
Reports for Genossenschaft Getreidesammelstelle Landquart
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft Getreidesammelstelle Landquart
- Genossenschaft Getreidesammelstelle Landquart with its legal headquarters in Landquart is a Cooperative from the sector «Trading in agricultural products and livestock». Genossenschaft Getreidesammelstelle Landquart is active.
- Genossenschaft Getreidesammelstelle Landquart has 6 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 26.07.2022.
- Genossenschaft Getreidesammelstelle Landquart is registered in the Canton of GR under the UID CHE-102.168.390.
Management (6)
newest members of the administration
Peter Philipp,
Franco Dosch,
Lukas Enderlin,
Ulrich Günthardt,
Peter Martin Schumacher
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.08.1968
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Landquart
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.5.000.215-9
UID/VAT
CHE-102.168.390
Sector
Trading in agricultural products and livestock
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Getreideübernahme von den Genossenschaftern sofort nach der Ernte, bzw. nach dem Dreschen, Behandlung und Lagerung des Getreides bis zur Übernahme durch den Bund, Ablieferung des übernommenen Getreides an den Bund, Ausführung von Lohnaufträgen für die Behandlung, Verarbeitung und Vermittlung von Futtergetreide und Raps.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft Getreidesammelstelle Landquart
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005529355, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Genossenschaft Getreidesammelstelle Landquart, in Landquart, CHE-102.168.390, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 9 vom 14.01.2021, Publ. 1005073888).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Geisser, Hanspeter, von Nesslau, in Maienfeld, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Laim, Andrea, von Albula/Alvra, in Domleschg, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Publication number: HR02-1005073888, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Genossenschaft Getreidesammelstelle Landquart, in Landquart, CHE-102.168.390, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 132 vom 10.07.2020, Publ. 1004934358).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Canetg, Mario, von Domat/Ems, in Domat/Ems, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Berther, Christian, von Tujetsch, in Landquart (Igis), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, Aktuar.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Philipp, Peter, von Untervaz, in Untervaz, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Trimmis, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004934358, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Genossenschaft Getreidesammelstelle Landquart, in Landquart, CHE-102.168.390, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 100 vom 28.05.2015, S.0, Publ. 2173457).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zindel-Gröbli, Rudolf, von Maienfeld, in Maienfeld, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Barfuss, Silvan, von Igis, in Landquart (Igis), Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Danuser-Jost, Robert, von Bad Ragaz, in Bad Ragaz, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Kirchler, Joachim, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zizers, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Philipp, Peter, von Untervaz, in Trimmis, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Dosch, Franco, von Bad Ragaz, in Bad Ragaz, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Enderlin, Lukas, von Maienfeld, in Maienfeld, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Günthardt, Ulrich, von Landquart, in Landquart, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Geisser, Hanspeter, von Nesslau, in Maienfeld, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.