Address
c/o Hans Jürg Luzi
Spätzeren 18
8843 Oberiberg
Reports for Genossenschaft Dolen-Rietli-Spätzeren
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft Dolen-Rietli-Spätzeren
- Genossenschaft Dolen-Rietli-Spätzeren has its legal headquarters in Oberiberg, is active and operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 28.01.2022.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Genossenschaft Dolen-Rietli-Spätzeren is the following: CHE-101.483.618.
Management (4)
newest members of the administration
Manuel Rudolf,
Tina Louise Ross Rudolf,
Ernst Brupbacher,
Hans Jürg Luzi
newest authorized signatories
Manuel Rudolf,
Tina Louise Ross Rudolf,
Ernst Brupbacher,
Hans Jürg Luzi
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.01.1972
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberiberg
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.0.001.793-7
UID/VAT
CHE-101.483.618
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Gemeinsame Erschliessung der im Ueberbauungsgebiet "Dolen-Rietli-Spätzeren" befindlichen Liegenschaften und davon abzutrennenden Einzelparzellen durch Verwirklichung einheitlicher Projekte für Quartierstrassen, Versorgung mit Wasser, Telefon, Elektrizität, Kanalisation, sowie durch den gemeinschaftlichen Unterhalt genossenschaftseigener Anlagen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft Dolen-Rietli-Spätzeren
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005391962, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Genossenschaft Dolen-Rietli-Spätzeren, in Oberiberg, CHE-101.483.618, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 209 vom 27.10.2020, Publ. 1005008780).
Domizil neu:
c/o Hans Jürg Luzi, Spätzeren 18, 8843 Oberiberg.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Keller-Bürgi, Margrith, von Altendorf, in Altendorf, Mitglied, Kassierin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Luzi, Hans Jürg, von Arosa, in Oberiberg, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Aeugst am Albis];
Ross Rudolf, Tina Louise, von Schönenbuch, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rudolf, Manuel, von Zurzach, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005008780, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Genossenschaft Dolen-Rietli-Spätzeren, in Oberiberg, CHE-101.483.618, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 167 vom 30.08.2018, Publ. 4443245).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Höfert-Blaser, Caroline Liliane, von Langnau im Emmental, in Wädenswil, Mitglied und Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Iselin, Walter Urs, von Amlikon-Bissegg, in Dietikon, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4443245, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Genossenschaft Dolen-Rietli-Spätzeren, in Oberiberg, CHE-101.483.618, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 167 vom 30.08.2016, Publ. 3027279).
Weitere Adressen:
[gestrichen: Firma bei Hans Jürg Luzi, Dorfstrasse 14, 8914 Aeugst am Albis].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schneider, René, von Signau, in Seuzach, Mitglied und Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Höfert-Blaser, Caroline Liliane, von Langnau im Emmental, in Wädenswil, Mitglied und Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.