Address
c/o Renate Brönnimann-Baur
Blümlisalpweg 9
3114 Wichtrach
Reports for Genossenschaft Braunviehzuchtverband des Kantons Bern
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft Braunviehzuchtverband des Kantons Bern
- Genossenschaft Braunviehzuchtverband des Kantons Bern is a Cooperative with its legal headquarters in Wichtrach. Genossenschaft Braunviehzuchtverband des Kantons Bern belongs to the industry «Associations and federations» and is currently active.
- The organization was founded on 20.05.1970.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 16.11.2022.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Genossenschaft Braunviehzuchtverband des Kantons Bern is the following: CHE-101.545.389.
Management (11)
newest members of the administration
Bruno Wyss,
Niklaus Nydegger,
Alfred Anderegg-von Bergen,
Bruno Gisler,
Christian Zürcher
newest authorized signatories
Andreas Niederhauser,
Daniel Graber,
Hans Egli,
Renate Brönnimann-Baur
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.05.1970
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Wichtrach
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.5.001.611-2
UID/VAT
CHE-101.545.389
Sector
Associations and federations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Genossenschaft bezweckt die Wahrung der Interessen der bernischen Braunviehzüchter und pflegt und vertieft die Zusammenarbeit unter denselben durch geeignete Massnahmen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Braunviehzuchtverband des Kantons Bern
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft Braunviehzuchtverband des Kantons Bern
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005605343, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Genossenschaft Braunviehzuchtverband des Kantons Bern, in Wichtrach, CHE-101.545.389, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 30.11.2020, Publ. 1005034426).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Feuz, Anton, von Gsteigwiler, in Faulensee (Spiez), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Hänni, Werner, von Köniz, in Riggisberg, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nydegger, Niklaus, von Schwarzenburg, in Schwarzenburg, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Wyss, Bruno, von Lauterbrunnen, in Bönigen b. Interlaken (Bönigen), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005034426, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Genossenschaft Braunviehzuchtverband des Kantons Bern, in Wichtrach, CHE-101.545.389, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 36 vom 21.02.2020, Publ. 1004835717).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kehrli, Alexander, von Innertkirchen, in Innertkirchen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Anderegg, Alfred, von Meiringen, in Meiringen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004835717, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Genossenschaft Braunviehzuchtverband des Kantons Bern, in Wichtrach, CHE-101.545.389, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 208 vom 26.10.2016, Publ. 3127765).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rohrbach, Rolf, von Aarwangen, in Aarwangen, Mitglied, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten;
Winterberger, Franz, von Schattenhalb, in Meiringen, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Niederhauser, Andreas, von Bowil, in Renan BE, Mitglied und Kassier der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Brönnimann-Baur, Renate, von Sarmenstorf und Köniz, in Wichtrach, Mitglied und Sekretärin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten [bisher: Mitglied und Sekretärin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten];
Feuz, Anton, von Gsteigwiler, in Faulensee (Spiez), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Gisler, Bruno, von Bürglen (UR), in Rumisberg, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Hänni, Werner, von Köniz, in Riggisberg, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Jost, Christian, von Hellsau, in Wynigen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Ruchti, Daniel, von Rapperswil (BE), in Seedorf BE, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Zürcher, Christian, von Trub, in Trubschachen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.