Reports for Genossenschaft Alterswohnungen Grabs
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft Alterswohnungen Grabs
- Genossenschaft Alterswohnungen Grabs with its legal headquarters in Grabs is active. Genossenschaft Alterswohnungen Grabs operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management consists of 6 persons. The organization was founded on 16.05.1990.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 29.09.2022.
- The organization's UID is CHE-102.293.612.
Management (6)
newest members of the administration
Regula Margaretha Bachmann Küng,
Markus Rüdisühli,
Urs Lendenmann,
Werner Vetsch-Dutler,
Samuel Rhyner
newest authorized signatories
Regula Margaretha Bachmann Küng,
Urs Lendenmann,
Werner Vetsch-Dutler,
Samuel Rhyner,
Erika Gerber
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.05.1990
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Grabs
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.5.031.504-1
UID/VAT
CHE-102.293.612
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Errichtung, Beschaffung und Vermietung von preisgünstigen Wohnungen, insbesondere für Betagte. Die Tätigkeit der Genossenschaft ist gemeinnützig und nicht gewinnstrebig.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft Alterswohnungen Grabs
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005571801, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Genossenschaft Alterswohnungen Grabs, in Grabs, CHE-102.293.612, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 72 vom 12.04.2022, Publ. 1005449132).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Belleville Schwendener, Gertrud genannt Trudi, von Poschiavo, Buchs SG und Sevelen, in Grabs, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bachmann Küng, Regula Margaretha, von Zürich, in Grabs, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005449132, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Genossenschaft Alterswohnungen Grabs, in Grabs, CHE-102.293.612, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 201 vom 15.10.2020, Publ. 1005000760).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gächter, Katharina, von Grabs, in Grabs, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rüdisühli, Markus, von Sennwald, in Grabs, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005000760, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Genossenschaft Alterswohnungen Grabs, in Grabs, CHE-102.293.612, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 74 vom 17.04.2020, Publ. 1004872843).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Geering, Walter, von Opfikon, in Grabs, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hess, Ursula, von Grabs, in Grabs, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lendenmann, Urs, von Grabs, in Grabs, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.