Reports for Gemeinnütziger Verein Caritas Aargau
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gemeinnütziger Verein Caritas Aargau
- Gemeinnütziger Verein Caritas Aargau is currently active and the industry «Other social services». The legal headquarters are in Aarau.
- The management consists of 9 persons. The organization was founded on 17.05.1983.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 15.03.2024.
- Gemeinnütziger Verein Caritas Aargau is registered in the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-105.892.217.
Management (9)
newest members of the committee
Elisabeth Burgener Brogli,
Anita Berger,
Alexandra Winkler,
Lydia Spuler Meier,
Maria Pia Scholl
newest authorized signatories
Elisabeth Burgener Brogli,
Anita Berger,
Roger Peterhans,
Emil Inauen,
Fabienne Notter
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.05.1983
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Aarau
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.6.005.095-9
UID/VAT
CHE-105.892.217
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Der Verein bezweckt die Förderung des diakonischen Denkens und Handelns auf der Grundlage der Botschaft Christi. Caritas Aargau engagiert sich solidarisch, friedensfördernd und nachhaltig für die gesamte Gesellschaft des Kantons ungeachtet der religiösen und politischen Anschauung sowie der ethnischen Zugehörigkeit der Zielgruppen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Verein Caritas Aargau
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gemeinnütziger Verein Caritas Aargau
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005986980, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Gemeinnütziger Verein Caritas Aargau, in Aarau, CHE-105.892.217, Verein (SHAB Nr. 110 vom 09.06.2023, Publ. 1005765317).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Niederberger, Beat, von Dallenwil, in Bottenwil, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burgener Brogli, Elisabeth, von Saas-Fee, in Gipf-Oberfrick, Präsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005765317, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Gemeinnütziger Verein Caritas Aargau, in Aarau, CHE-105.892.217, Verein (SHAB Nr. 40 vom 25.02.2022, Publ. 1005414834).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schär, Elisabeth, von Gondiswil, in Niedergösgen, Vizepräsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Chapuis, Claudia, von Grandfontaine, in Wettingen, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Hug, Franziska, von Egerkingen, in Vordemwald, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kelm, Birgit, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Buchs (AG), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Berger, Anita, von St. Gallen, in Staufen, Vizepräsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Winkler, Alexandra, von Mettauertal, in Wettingen, Mitglied des Vorstandes, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Peterhans, Roger, von Fislisbach, in Hausen (AG), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005414834, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Gemeinnütziger Verein Caritas Aargau, in Aarau, CHE-105.892.217, Verein (SHAB Nr. 176 vom 10.09.2021, Publ. 1005288996).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rohrer, Verena, von Buchs (SG), in Küttigen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kelm, Birgit, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Buchs (AG), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.