Address
c/o RA Julia Heer
Zähringerstrasse 51, ADVOCENTRAL Advokaturen
8001 Zürich
Reports for gdz-Rentenkasse
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout gdz-Rentenkasse
- gdz-Rentenkasse is active in the industry «Operation of an pension fund» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Zürich.
- gdz-Rentenkasse has 6 persons entered in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 16.02.2024.
- gdz-Rentenkasse is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-110.375.560.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Jordi Serra,
Andreas Hoppler,
Friedrich Karl Simshäuser,
Günther Flumm
newest authorized signatories
Jordi Serra,
Julia Heer,
Andreas Hoppler,
Friedrich Karl Simshäuser,
Günther Flumm
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.05.1925
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.901.450-7
UID/VAT
CHE-110.375.560
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckte bis zum 31.12.2004 die berufliche Vorsorge im Rahmen des BVG und seiner Ausführungsbestimmungen für die Mitarbeiter der gdz und mit dieser wirtschaftlich oder finanziell eng verbundener Unternehmungen, sowie für deren Angehörige oder Hinterlassene gegen die wirtschaftlichen Folgen von Alter, Tod und Invalidität. Der Anschluss einer verbundenen Unternehmung erfolgte aufgrund einer schriftlichen Anschlussvereinbarung, die der Aufsichtsbehörde vorgelegt wird. Ab 01.01.2005 bezweckt sie die Fortführung der Vorsorge für Leistungen, die am 31.12.2004 in der Stiftung bestanden haben sowie die Vorsorge für die Angehörigen und Hinterlassenen der genannten Leistungsbezüger. Die Stiftung kann über die gesetzlichen Mindestleistungen hinaus weitergehende Vorsorge betreiben, einschliesslich Unterstützungsleistungen in Notlagen, wie bei Krankheit, Unfall oder Arbeitslosigkeit. Zur Erreichung ihres Zweckes kann die Stiftung Versicherungsverträge abschliessen oder in bestehende Verträge eintreten, wobei sie selbst Versicherungsnehmerin und Begünstigte ist.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
a&o kreston audit ag | Zürich | 19.07.2019 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Controva AG | Zürich | 14.04.2015 | 18.07.2019 | |
Arpagaus & Baumer Consulting AG | Zürich | 17.07.2006 | 13.04.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- GDZ-Vorsorgestiftung
- gdz-Vorsorgestiftung
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: gdz-Rentenkasse
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005962786, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
gdz-Rentenkasse, in Zürich, CHE-110.375.560, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 133 vom 12.07.2023, Publ. 1005793155).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Serra, Jordi, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Serra, Jorge].
Publication number: HR02-1005793155, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
gdz-Rentenkasse, in Zürich, CHE-110.375.560, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 8 vom 12.01.2023, Publ. 1005650230).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Steiger, Rudolf, von Zürich, in Zürich, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Serra, Jorge, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005650230, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
gdz-Rentenkasse, in Zürich, CHE-110.375.560, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 113 vom 14.06.2022, Publ. 1005494502).
Domizil neu:
c/o RA Julia Heer, Zähringerstrasse 51, ADVOCENTRAL Advokaturen, 8001 Zürich.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.