Reports for GDCGEO Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout GDCGEO Sàrl
- GDCGEO Sàrl from Le Châble VS operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities» and is active.
- There are 5 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 24.01.2024.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VS is CHE-189.079.239.
Management (5)
Executive board
Christian Olivier Hagin,
Christophe André Cachat,
Jean-Daniel Gay des Combes,
Patrick Nicolas Lathion
newest authorized signatories
Christian Olivier Hagin,
Christophe André Cachat,
Jean-Daniel Gay des Combes,
Patrick Nicolas Lathion
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.01.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Val de Bagnes
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.4.009.811-8
UID/VAT
CHE-189.079.239
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'un bureau d'ingénieurs géomètres brevetés comprenant les secteurs d'activités suivants : mensuration, génie rural, photogrammétrie, système d'information du territoire, mesures laser et satellite, ainsi que tous les domaines convergents, toutes opérations mobilières, immobilières, financières convergentes (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: GDCGEO Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005943223, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
GDCGEO Sàrl, à Val de Bagnes, CHE-189.079.239, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 243 du 14.12.2023, Publ. 1005910464).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Geosat SA (CHE-105.712.060), à Sion, associée, pour 4 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Gay des Combes, Jean Daniel, de Finhaut, à Val de Bagnes, associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 4 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: pour 16 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00];
GEODESIS SA (CHE-168.545.885), à Troistorrents, associée, pour 16 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00.
Publication number: HR02-1005910464, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
GDCGEO Sàrl, à Val de Bagnes, CHE-189.079.239, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 4 du 07.01.2021, Publ. 1005066789).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Gay des Combes, Jean Daniel, de Finhaut, à Val de Bagnes, associé et gérant, avec signature collective à deux, pour 16 parts sociales de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: à Bagnes, associé et président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux];
Hagin, Christian, de Bern, à Troistorrents, président des gérants, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: de Berne, gérant, avec signature collective à deux avec le président];
Lathion, Patrick, de Veysonnaz, à Veysonnaz, gérant, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: gérant, avec signature collective à deux avec le président];
Cachat, Christophe André, de Saint-Gingolph, à Monthey, gérant, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005066789, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
GDCGEO Sàrl, à Bagnes, CHE-189.079.239, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 10 du 16.01.2017, p.0, Publ. 3285667).
Nouveau siège:
Val de Bagnes. [Siège modifié d'office par suite d'entrée en vigueur de la fusion des communes de Vollèges et Bagnes].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.