Reports for Gatti System AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gatti System AG
- Gatti System AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Nidau. Gatti System AG belongs to the industry «Architectural and engineering activities» and is currently active.
- Gatti System AG was founded on 01.07.1997.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 18.11.2022.
- The company is registered in the commercial register BE under the UID CHE-108.634.953.
- Alpina hospitality AG, Azzurro Beteiligungen AG, G. Baumann & F. Khanlari SIA SWB, Architekten AG have the same address as Gatti System AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
Sascha Jörg Simon,
Dominik Sutter,
Hans Gertsch,
Andrea Daniela Gertsch,
Sarah Michaela Gertsch
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Sascha Jörg Simon,
Dominik Sutter,
Hans Gertsch,
Andrea Daniela Gertsch,
Sarah Michaela Gertsch
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.07.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Nidau
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.006.502-7
UID/VAT
CHE-108.634.953
CHE-315.447.802 VAT
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Planung von Gattti-Systemgerüsten sowie die Erbringung von Verwaltungsdienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an andern Unternehmungen mit gleichem oder ähnlichem Zweck im In- und Ausland beteiligen oder solche Unternehmungen übernehmen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte durchführen, die mit dem Gesellschaftszweck direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen oder ihn zu fördern geeignet sind. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ENGEL COPERA AG | Köniz | 18.02.2010 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Reluko Treuhand AG | Biel/Bienne | 27.04.2009 | 17.02.2010 | |
Racine Treuhand | Biel/Bienne | <2004 | 26.04.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gatti System AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005607580, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gatti System AG, in Nidau, CHE-108.634.953, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 25.05.2020, Publ. 1004895456).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gertsch, Brigitta, von Lauterbrunnen, in Studen BE, Mitglied und Sekretärin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sutter, Dominik, von Büren an der Aare, in Ipsach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gertsch, Hans, von Lauterbrunnen, in Studen BE, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Simon, Sascha Jörg, von Glarus Nord, in Ipsach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004895456, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gatti System AG, in Nidau, CHE-108.634.953, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 34 vom 18.02.2010, S.5, Publ. 5501600).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gertsch, Hans, von Lauterbrunnen, in Studen BE, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gertsch, Brigitta, von Lauterbrunnen, in Studen BE, Mitglied und Sekretärin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied und Sekretärin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gertsch, Andrea, von Lauterbrunnen, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Studen BE, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gertsch, Sarah, von Lauterbrunnen, in Nidau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Port, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Sutter, Dominik, von Büren an der Aare, in Ipsach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
ENGEL COPERA AG (CHE-103.132.443), in Liebefeld (Köniz), Revisionsstelle [bisher: ENGEL COPERA (CH-035.3.010.753-4), in Köniz, ohne eingetragene Funktion, ohne Angabe zur Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Publication number: 5501600, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gatti System AG, in Nidau, CH-073.3.006.502-7, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 168 vom 01.09.2009, S. 4, Publ. 5225052).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Reluko Treuhand AG (CH-073.3.002.011-5), in Biel/Bienne, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
ENGEL COPERA (CH-035.3.010.753-4), in Köniz.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.