Reports for Gasthof Schützen Steffisburg AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gasthof Schützen Steffisburg AG
- Gasthof Schützen Steffisburg AG has its legal headquarters in Steffisburg, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses».
- The management consists of 5 persons. The company was founded on 09.07.1997.
- The last commercial register change was made on 22.01.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-101.974.000.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Evelyne Morf,
Sarah Stübi,
David Ernst Hauenstein,
Alfred Blaser,
Urs Hauenstein
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.07.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Steffisburg
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.006.841-2
UID/VAT
CHE-101.974.000
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb und Organisation von Hotel-, Restaurant- und Gastwirtschaftsbetrieben, Uebernahme und Führung von Betrieben der Touristik im weitesten Sinne, insbesondere Uebernahme und Führung des Landgasthof Schützen in Steffisburg. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
wirtschaftsprüfung.gf ag | Ostermundigen | 20.02.2013 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ReHA Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft GmbH in Liquidation | Konolfingen | 23.02.2006 | 05.03.2006 | |
Schökle Steuern und Buchhaltungen GmbH in Liquidation | Frick | <2004 | 22.02.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Landgasthof Schützen Steffisburg AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gasthof Schützen Steffisburg AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005939824, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gasthof Schützen Steffisburg AG, in Steffisburg, CHE-101.974.000, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 189 vom 29.09.2020, Publ. 1004987882).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hauenstein, David Ernst, von Steffisburg, in Hünibach (Hilterfingen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Heimberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Morf, Evelyne, von Stocken-Höfen, in Thun, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien jedoch nicht mit Stübi Sarah;
Stübi, Sarah, von Rüeggisberg, in Steffisburg, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien jedoch nicht mit Morf Evelyne.
Publication number: HR02-1004987882, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gasthof Schützen Steffisburg AG, in Steffisburg, CHE-101.974.000, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 96 vom 20.05.2019, Publ. 1004633412).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rosser, Christopher, von Frutigen, in Bönigen b. Interlaken (Bönigen), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hauenstein, Urs, von Ringgenberg (BE) und Steffisburg, in Steffisburg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Blaser, Alfred, von Trubschachen, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Hauenstein, David Ernst, von Steffisburg, in Heimberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004633412, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gasthof Schützen Steffisburg AG, in Steffisburg, CHE-101.974.000, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 51 vom 14.03.2017, Publ. 3401821).
Statutenänderung:
13.05.2019.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 4'000'000.00 [bisher: CHF 150'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 4'000'000.00 [bisher: CHF 150'000.00].
Aktien neu:
4'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 150 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00]. Bei der ordentlichen Kapitalerhöhung vom 13.05.2019 wird eine Forderung in der Höhe von CHF 3'850'000.00 verrechnet, wofür 3'850 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 ausgegeben werden.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.