Reports for Garbani AG Bern
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Garbani AG Bern
- Garbani AG Bern has its legal headquarters in Bern and is active. It operates in the sector «Other construction».
- Garbani AG Bern has 4 persons entered in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 08.11.2021. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-105.975.056.
- Next to the company Garbani AG Bern there are 19 other active companies with an identical address. These include: atelier bpunkt GmbH, Baugesellschaft Effingerstrasse AG, Baugesellschaft Eichholz AG.
Management (4)
newest board members
Dr. Stephan Andreas Herren,
Pietro Marco Garbani,
Marco Alessandro Garbani
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Stephan Andreas Herren,
Pietro Marco Garbani,
Adrian Sallin,
Marco Alessandro Garbani
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.01.1957
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.005.438-3
UID/VAT
CHE-105.975.056
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Gipser- und Malergeschäftes, einer Schriftenmalerei, einer Siebdruckerei und eines Emaillierwerkes; Kauf, Überbauung, Verkauf und Verwaltung von Liegenschaften.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Bern | 06.03.2015 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
von Graffenried AG Treuhand | Bern | <2004 | 05.03.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Garbani AG Bern
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005328617, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Garbani AG Bern, in Bern, CHE-105.975.056, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 02.05.2016, Publ. 2810131).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Perreten, Hanna, von Lauenen, in Bern, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Zumbrunn, Heinz, von Bolligen und Ringgenberg BE, in Bolligen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Garbani, Marco, von Bern und Onsernone, in Bremgarten b. Bern (Bremgarten bei Bern), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Bern und Gresso, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Herren, Stephan Dr., von Neuenegg, in Bern, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Garbani, Pietro, von Bern und Onsernone, in Ittigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Bern und Gresso, Vizepräsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Sallin, Adrian, von Gibloux, in Schmitten FR, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 2810131, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Garbani AG Bern, in Bern, CHE-105.975.056, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 120 vom 25.06.2015, Publ. 2229921).
Weitere Adressen:
Bielstrasse 1 C, 3232 Ins.
Publication number: 2229921, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Garbani AG Bern, in Bern, CHE-105.975.056, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 45 vom 06.03.2015, Publ. 2027307).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Garbani, Marco, von Bern und Gresso, in Bremgarten bei Bern, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Krauchthal, Vizepräsident mit Einzelunterschrift];
Garbani, Pietro, von Bern und Gresso, in Ittigen, Vizepräsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.