Reports for Garage Bosshardt AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Garage Bosshardt AG
- Garage Bosshardt AG in Fällanden is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles». Garage Bosshardt AG is active.
- The management has 5 active persons registered.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 08.08.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Garage Bosshardt AG is the following: CHE-107.669.995.
Management (5)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Nicola Gioia,
Markus Bosshardt,
Gabriela Bosshardt,
Thomas Bosshardt,
Urs Ribar
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.06.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Fällanden
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.019.825-4
UID/VAT
CHE-107.669.995
Sector
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Motorfahrzeugen sowie Betrieb einer Autoreparatur-Werkstatt mit Tankstelle und Autowaschanlage; kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen sowie Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIGAS Autogewerbe-Treuhand der Schweiz AG | Köniz | 19.04.2023 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Consultive Revisions AG | Winterthur | 14.08.2013 | 18.04.2023 | |
Gubler Treuhand GmbH | Winterthur | <2004 | 13.08.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Garage Bosshardt AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005811622, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Garage Bosshardt AG, in Fällanden, CHE-107.669.995, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 19.04.2023, Publ. 1005726920).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gioia, Nicola, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Schaffhausen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ribar, Urs, von Wollerau, in Illnau-Effretikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Schlieren].
Publication number: HR02-1005726920, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Garage Bosshardt AG, in Fällanden, CHE-107.669.995, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 145 vom 30.07.2019, Publ. 1004686688).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Consultive Revisions AG (CHE-105.253.715), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
FIGAS Autogewerbe-Treuhand der Schweiz AG (CHE-113.339.187), in Köniz, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004686688, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Garage Bosshardt AG, in Fällanden, CHE-107.669.995, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 155 vom 14.08.2013, S.0, Publ. 1026623).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bosshardt-Alder, Ernst, von Maur, in Fällanden, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Bosshardt-Alder, Helena, von Maur, in Fällanden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bosshardt, Markus, von Maur, in Fällanden, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Bosshardt, Gabriela, von Maur, in Fällanden, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bosshardt, Thomas, von Maur, in Meilen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Consultive Revisions AG (CHE-105.253.715), in Winterthur, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Consultive Revisions AG (CH-020.4.020.749-1)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.