Reports for GAP Engineering SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout GAP Engineering SA
- GAP Engineering SA with its legal headquarters in Chalais is active. GAP Engineering SA operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 22.09.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company GAP Engineering SA is the following: CHE-101.386.731.
Management (4)
newest board members
Yannick Berner,
Julien Valloton,
Sébastien Salamin,
Patrick Salvy
newest authorized signatories
Yannick Berner,
Julien Valloton,
Sébastien Salamin,
Patrick Salvy
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.11.2000
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Chalais
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.005.637-0
UID/VAT
CHE-101.386.731
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exercer les activités d'un bureau d'ingénieur en électricité et mécanique pour l'étude, la conception et le développement d'installations industrielles; vendre des installations industrielles sous son propre nom, comprenant des composants mécaniques, électriques et d'automatisation; vendre des parties, accessoires et pièces de rechange d'installations industrielles; superviser le câblage électrique et/ou montage mécanique d'installations industrielles sur site de clients finaux; la mise en service électrique, mécanique et d'automation d'installations industrielles; exécuter toutes activités convergentes (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Vincent Epiney Sàrl | Sierre | 09.09.2022 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidconsult Sàrl | Sion | 21.05.2019 | 08.09.2022 | |
Rodex SA | Noble-Contrée | <2004 | 09.11.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: GAP Engineering SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005844127, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
GAP Engineering SA, à Chalais, CHE-101.386.731, société anonyme (No. FOSC 175 du 09.09.2022, Publ. 1005558780).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Mabillard, Gilles, de Grimisuat, à Sion, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Berner, Yannick, de Guggisberg, à Vétroz, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005558780, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
GAP Engineering SA, à Chalais, CHE-101.386.731, société anonyme (No. FOSC 174 du 08.09.2020, Publ. 1004974536).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Schillaci, Alfio, de Carouge GE, à Bussigny-près-Lausanne, administrateur, directeur, avec signature collective à deux, avec signature collective à deux;
Fidconsult Sàrl (CHE-380.690.217), à Sion, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Valloton, Julien, de Fully, à Leytron, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur, avec signature collective à deux];
Mabillard, Gilles, de Grimisuat, à Sion, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: président, avec signature collective à deux];
Salamin, Sébastien, de Anniviers, à Anniviers, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux;
Fiduciaire Vincent Epiney Sàrl (CHE-187.681.885), à Sierre, organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1004974536, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
GAP Engineering SA, à Sierre, CHE-101.386.731, société anonyme (No. FOSC 97 du 21.05.2019, Publ. 1004635167).
Modification des statuts:
01.09.2020.
Nouveau siège:
Chalais.
Nouvelle adresse:
Route de Chippis 71, 3966 Chalais. [Modification des statuts sur des points non soumis à publication].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.