Reports for Galliker Transport AG Möhlin
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Galliker Transport AG Möhlin
- Galliker Transport AG Möhlin with its legal headquarters in Möhlin is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Other transportation services». Galliker Transport AG Möhlin is active.
- The company was founded on 07.08.1997.
- The last commercial register change was made on 20.08.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is CHE-108.657.032.
Management (24)
newest board members
Rolf Galliker,
Peter Galliker-Limacher Jun.,
Esther Studer-Galliker
newest authorized signatories
Jörg Marti,
Martin Daniel Lustenberger,
Savo Dragicevic,
Sandra Weiss Graf,
Daniel Thomas Zimmermann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.08.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Möhlin
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.000.512-5
UID/VAT
CHE-108.657.032
Sector
Other transportation services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Übernahme, Ausführung und Vermittlung von Transporten aller Art, insbesondere Lebensmitteltransporten sowie Einlagerung, Logistik, Umschlag und Spedition von Gütern jeglicher Art. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Luzern | <2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Galliker Transport AG Pratteln
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Galliker Transport AG Möhlin
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006110293, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Galliker Transport AG Möhlin, in Möhlin, CHE-108.657.032, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 64 vom 31.03.2023, Publ. 1005714587).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dragicevic, Savo, bosnisch-herzegowinischer Staatsangehöriger, in Rothrist, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Lustenberger, Martin Daniel, von Luthern, in Dagmersellen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Marti, Jörg, von Dagmersellen, in Dagmersellen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005714587, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Galliker Transport AG Möhlin, in Möhlin, CHE-108.657.032, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 188 vom 28.09.2022, Publ. 1005570968).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Barmettler, Paul, von Buochs, in Oberdorf NW, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Galliker, Peter, 1940, von Luthern und Willisau, in Altishofen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Galliker, Peter, ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Weiss Graf, Sandra, von Zug, in Nebikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005570968, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Galliker Transport AG Möhlin, in Möhlin, CHE-108.657.032, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 15 vom 21.01.2022, Publ. 1005386820).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Studer-Galliker, Fabian, von Hasle (LU) und Wolhusen, in Egolzwil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien nicht mit Esther Studer-Galliker und Caroline Studer.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Studer-Galliker, Esther, von Luthern und Wolhusen, in Egolzwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien nicht mit Fabio Studer und Caroline Studer [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien nicht mit Fabian Studer-Galliker und Caroline Studer];
Galliker, Peter, 1989, von Luthern, in Nebikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien nicht mit Peter Galliker-Limacher, 1963, und Philipp Galliker [bisher: in Dagmersellen];
Galliker-Wechsler, Sabrina, von Willisau, in Egolzwil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien nicht mit Rolf Galliker und Corinne Galliker [bisher: Galliker, Sabrina, in Schenkon];
Studer, Caroline, von Wolhusen, in Sursee, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien nicht mit Esther Studer-Galliker und Fabio Studer [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien nicht mit Esther Studer-Galliker und Fabian Studer-Galliker];
Studer, Fabio, von Wolhusen, in Egolzwil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien nicht mit Esther Studer-Galliker und Caroline Studer;
Felder, Felix, von Hergiswil bei Willisau, in Emmen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Meier, Ulrich, von Willisau, in Willisau, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Müller, Thomas, von Luzern, in Ruswil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Spahr, Jérôme, von Böztal, in Härkingen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Kappel (SO)];
Wechsler, Thomas, von Luthern, in Aarburg, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Rothrist];
Zimmermann, Daniel, von Winterthur, in Windisch, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.