Reports for Gaillard et fils SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gaillard et fils SA
- Gaillard et fils SA has its legal headquarters in Epesses and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Viticulture».
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 20.09.2019.
- The company's UID is CHE-101.743.334.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.07.1990
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bourg-en-Lavaux
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.131.021-6
UID/VAT
CHE-101.743.334
Sector
Viticulture
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Commerce de vins en vrac ou en bouteilles, vinification, mise en bouteilles, travaux de caves et tous travaux dans le domaine de la viticulture (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TDS Révision Sàrl | Chavannes-près-Renens | 08.06.2015 | 10.04.2017 | |
JTS Fiduciaire et Révision Jacques Tschabold | Ormont-Dessous | 29.05.2013 | 07.06.2015 | |
Fidugère partenaires SA | Echallens | 23.07.2008 | 28.05.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gaillard et fils SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004720856, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Gaillard et fils S.A., à Bourg-en-Lavaux, CHE-101.743.334 (FOSC du 11.04.2017, p. 0/3462717). L'administrateur Gaillard Jean-René est nommé président.
Nouvelle administratrice avec signature individuelle:
Gaillard Gerardina, d'Orsières, à Bourg-en-Lavaux.
Publication number: 3462717, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Gaillard et fils S.A., à Bourg-en-Lavaux, CHE-101.743.334 (FOSC du 27.09.2016, p. 0/3075875). TDS Révision Sàrl (CHE-196.193.886) n'est plus organe de révision. Selon déclaration du 27 mars 2017, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Publication number: 3075875, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Gaillard et fils S.A., à Bourg-en-Lavaux, CHE-101.743.334 (FOSC du 08.06.2015, p. 0/2193663). Gaillard Pierre n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Gaillard Jean-René, qui n'est plus président, reste seul administrateur.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.